Santacruz et al v. Southbank Dairies LLC et al
Plaintiff: Victor Santacruz, Luis Santacruz, Cirilo Mancinas Lopez, Raymundo Martinez, Lucia Garcia and William Alcantar
Defendant: Jerry D Foster and Southbank Dairies LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv05200
Filed: March 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Lewis
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ON PLEADING ENTITLED STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DEADLINE AND TO TAKE DEPOSITION re 53 . Discovery deadline extended to 2/21/2017. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) Paper copy sent to plaintiff @ Camas address . Modified on 2/2/2017 (JL).
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA, granting 37 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, granting 23 Motion to File Amended Complaint. Amended Complaint due 9/2/16. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DECLARE DEFENDANTS' FED. R. CIV. P. 68 OFFER OF JUDGMENT VOID, denying 12 . Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santacruz et al v. Southbank Dairies LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Santacruz
Represented By: Erin M Pettigrew
Represented By: Roger M Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Santacruz
Represented By: Erin M Pettigrew
Represented By: Roger M Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cirilo Mancinas Lopez
Represented By: Erin M Pettigrew
Represented By: Roger M Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymundo Martinez
Represented By: Erin M Pettigrew
Represented By: Roger M Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucia Garcia
Represented By: Erin M Pettigrew
Represented By: Roger M Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Alcantar
Represented By: Erin M Pettigrew
Represented By: Roger M Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry D Foster
Represented By: Trevor D Osborne
Represented By: Peter Thomas Petrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southbank Dairies LLC
Represented By: Trevor D Osborne
Represented By: Peter Thomas Petrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?