Sanchez vs. John Doe et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Flores Sanchez
Defendant: John Doe, Margaret Gilbert, Jane 1-3 Doe, Dennis Cherry and John Doe Cornwell
Case Number: 3:2016cv05201
Filed: March 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Grays Harbor
Presiding Judge: David W. Christel
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 48 Report and Recommendations. (TG; cc sent to plaintiff)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying 35 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Judge David W. Christel.(MET) cc: plaintiff
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 31 Report and Recommendations. (TG; cc mailed to plaintiff)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER entered re 13 Motion to Amend signed by Judge David W. Christel. The Clerk is directed to replace Defendant John Doe Cornwell with Defendant Michael Cornwell. Plaintiff is not required to file an amended complaint. (MET) cc: plaintiff
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 11 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Judge David W. Christel.(MET) cc: plaintiff
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez vs. John Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Flores Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane 1-3 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Cornwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?