W.H. et al v Olympia School District et al
Plaintiff: W.H., J.H. and B.M.
Defendant: Olympia School District, Jennifer Priddy, Frederick David Stanley, Barbara Greer, Dominic G Cvitanich and William V Lahmann
Case Number: 3:2016cv05273
Filed: April 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Thurston
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' 115 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' 95 motion for partial summary judgment is GRANTED. signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (ZMG)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 95 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ZMG)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' 89 Motion for Priority Trial Date, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (GMR)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting Defendants' 76 Motion to Certify Issues to the Washington State Supreme Court and to Stay Proceedings and Administratively close this matter, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (GMR)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying 42 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(TG)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 38 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(TG)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Strike.(TG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W.H. et al v Olympia School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.H.
Represented By: Darrell L Cochran
Represented By: Kevin M. Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.H.
Represented By: Darrell L Cochran
Represented By: Kevin M. Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.M.
Represented By: Darrell L Cochran
Represented By: Kevin M. Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olympia School District
Represented By: Jerry J Moberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Priddy
Represented By: Jerry J Moberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick David Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic G Cvitanich
Represented By: Jerry J Moberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William V Lahmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?