Malone et al v. Strong
Plaintiff: Calvin Malone, George Mitchell, Ronald Fox, Richard Schoonover, Mark Robinson, John E Brooks, Chris Cantley, Jonathan Parsons, Joseph Townsend, Paul Geier, Scott Jones, George Hancock, Zachery Nelson, Bruce Rafford, Michael Cole, Jeremy Mathis, Gregory Jaeger, Duane Brennan, Matthew Hopkins, Dennis Dumas, Curtis Pouncy, Richard Jackson, Laura McCollum, Mikeel Azeem, Thomas Toomey, Tommy Coleman and James Turner
Defendant: Mark Strong
Case Number: 3:2016cv05284
Filed: April 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: David W. Christel
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting 119 Stipulated Motion Changing Names signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. The caption shall be corrected to reflect the change in name of (1) Dale Eldon Pittman to Adel Ellen Pittman and (2) Kenneth Alvern Haller, Jr. to Nikki Ann Iverson. (GMR)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting 114 Stipulated Motion for an order removing Brian Kuehn, as a plaintiff in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel.(CMG)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Granting 106 Motion to Extend Deadline and Add Parties, signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. The deadline to add parties is extended and the following individuals are hereby added as plaintiffs to this case: Ricardo Capello, William E Duncan, Donald Gamer, James Moseley, Robert Sheaffer and Barry Taylor. (GMR)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Denying Motions (Dkt. 66-71) for New Counsel; and MOTION for "Opt-Out Class" Status; signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. As Plaintiffs may have misunderstood the nature of the appointment of pro bono counsel, Plaintiffs may file motions to proceed pro se on or before September 18, 2017. (GMR- cc: Plaintiffs Robert E. Lough, Gary Shaw, Elmer Campbell, Tremayne Francis, Curtis Brogi, and William Curry, Jr.) ( 66 Motion filed by Plaintiff Robert E Lough ( 23 Motion in 3:17-cv-05164-RBL-DWC); 67 Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary Shaw ( 18 Motion in 3:17-cv-05162-RBL-DWC); 68 Motion filed by Plaintiff Elmer Campbell ( 19 Motion in 3:17-cv-05165-RBL-DWC); 69 Motion filed by Plaintiff Tremayne Francis ( 20 Motion in 3:16-cv-05961-RBL-DWC); 70 Motion filed by Plaintiff Curtis Brogi ( 21 Motion in 3:17-cv-05199-RBL-DWC); and 71 Motion filed by Plaintiff William Curry, Jr. ( 24 Motion in 3:16-cv-05989-RBL-DWC))
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel; adding Richard Roy Scott as a Plaintiff to Malone v Strong, 3:16-cv-05284-RBL-DWC; and Granting Plaintiff's Motions 56 to Bifurcate and 57 to Lift Stay in case 3:16-cv-05785-RBL-DWC. The Court anticipates Mr. Arbenz will enter an appearance on behalf of Plaintiff in the Related Case (Malone v Strong) on or before July 28, 2017. (GMR- cc: C. Arbenz via NEF in Malone v Strong; pltf)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE, by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. Case No. 3:16-cv-5874-RBL-DWC has been consolidated into this case, No. 3:16-cv-5284-RBL-DWC. All documents are to be filed in this matter and shall bear the Case No. 3:16-cv-5284-RBL-DWC. (GMR)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting the 52 Stipulated MOTION to Consolidate. The following cases should be consolidated with this case: C16-5547, C16-5535, C16-5544, C16-5555, C16-5549, C16-5532, C16-5539, C16-5541, C16-5548, C16-5551, C16-5546,C16-5540, C16-5284, C16-5546, C16-5530, C16-5542, C16-5537, C16-5854, C16-5550, C16-5534, C16-5533, C16-5538, and C16-5556. Signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. (CMG)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying the 46 Motion for Extension of Time as moot; and denying 47 Motion to Serve. Signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel.(CMG)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER APPOINTING CASEY ARBENZ AS REPRESENTATION LIMITED TO THESE CASES, by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. (3:16-cv-05284-RBL-DWC, Calvin Malone; 3:16-cv-05530-RBL-DWC, George Mitchell; 3:16-cv-05532-RBL-DWC, Ronald Fox; 3:16-cv-05533-RBL- DWC, Richard Schoonover; 3:16-cv-05534-RBL-DWC, Mark Robinson; 3:16-cv-05535-RBL-DWC, John E Brooks; 3:16-cv-05537-RBL-DWC, Jonathan Parsons; 3:16-cv-05539-RBL-DWC, Paul Geier; 3:16-cv-05540-RBL-DWC, Scott Jones; 3:16-cv-05541-RBL-DWC, George H ancock; 3:16-cv-05542-RBL-DWC, Zachary Nelson; 3:16-cv-05544-RBL-DWC, Michael Cole; 3:16-cv-05545-RBL-DWC, Jeremy Mathis; 3:16-cv-05546-RBL-DWC, Gregory Jaeger; 3:16-cv-05548-RBL-DWC, Matthew Hopkins; 3:16-cv-05549-RBL-DWC, Dennis Dumas; 3:16-cv-05550-RBL-DWC, Curtis Pouncy; 3:16-cv-05551-RBL-DWC, Richard Jackson; and 3:16-cv-05555-RBL-DWC, Tommy Coleman.) (GMR)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DIRECTING SUBSTITUTION AND DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE ADDRESS, signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. Defendant Mark Strong, former CEO of the Special Commitment Center is being sued in both his individual and official capacities [ 38] Complaint (filed by Calvin Malone). Because 41 Service was Returned Unexecuted as to Defendant Strong, the Court substitutes Bill Van Hook, the current CEO of SCC, for Mark Strong in his official capacity. Plaintiff Malone is directed to prov ide an updated address for Defendant Strong on behalf of all Plaintiffs in the Related Cases by October 21, 2016 so he may be served in his individual capacity. The Clerk will enter this Order in the following Related Cases: (5 in 3 :16-cv-05530-RBL-DWC) Complaint filed by George Mitchell; (5 in 3:16-cv-05532-RBL-DWC) Complaint filed by Ronald Fox; (5 in 3:16-cv-05533-RBL-DWC) Complaint filed by Richard Schoonover; (5 in 3:16-cv-05534-RBL-DWC) Complaint filed by Mark Rob inson; (5 in 3:16-cv-05535-RBL-DWC) Complaint filed by John E Brooks; (6 in 3:16-cv-05537-RBL-DWC) Complaint filed by Jonathan Parsons; (6 in 3:16-cv-05538-RBL-DWC) Complaint filed by Joseph Townsend; (6 in 3:16-cv-05539-RBL-DWC) Complaint file d by Paul Geier; (5 in 3:16-cv-05540-RBL-DWC) Complaint filed by Scott Jones; (5 in 3:16-cv-05541-RBL-DWC) Complaint filed by George Hancock; (5 in 3:16-cv-05542-RBL-DWC) Complaint filed by Zachary Nelson; (5 in 3:16-cv-05543-RBL-DWC) Complai nt filed by Bruce Rafford; (5 in 3:16-cv-05544-RBL-DWC) Complaint filed by Michael Cole; (5 in 3:16-cv-05545-RBL-DWC) Complaint filed by Jeremy Mathis; (6 in 3:16-cv-05546-RBL-DWC) Complaint filed by Gregory Jaeger; (6 in 3:16-cv-05547-RBL-DWC ) Complaint filed by Duane Brennan; (6 in 3:16-cv-05548-RBL-DWC) Complaint filed by Matthew Hopkins; (6 in 3:16-cv-05549-RBL-DWC) Complaint filed by Dennis Dumas; (5 in 3:16-cv-05550-RBL-DWC) Complaint filed by Curtis Pouncy; (6 in 3:16-cv-05 551-RBL-DWC) Complaint filed by Richard Jackson; (5 in 3:16-cv-05552-RBL-DWC) Complaint filed by Laura McCollum; (5 in 3:16-cv-05555-RBL-DWC) Complaint filed by Tommy Coleman; and (6 in 3:16-cv-05556-RBL-DWC) Complaint filed by James Turner. (GMR- cc: pltfs)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 32 Objections to Report and Recommendation; Plaintiffs' request for class action certification 28 is Denied Without Prejudice; plaintiffs Chris Cantley, Thomas Toomey, Ronald Fox, Joseph Tow nsend, Mark Robinson, George Hancock, Paul Geier, John E Brooks, Curtis Pouncy, Zachery Nelson, Duane Brennan, Matthew Hopkins, Calvin Malone, Dennis Dumas, James Turner, George Mitchell, Dennis T Dumas, Michael Cole, Laura McCollum, Ric hard Jackson, Bruce Rafford, Mikeel Azeem, Jonathan Parsons, Gregory Jaeger, Richard Schoonover, Scott Jones, Tommy Coleman, Jeremy Mathis are Dismissed from this action without prejudice and separate matters will be opened for each plaintiff; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 6/23/2016 (DN). (cc to all pltfs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malone et al v. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Schoonover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Cantley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Geier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachery Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Rafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Jaeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Dumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Pouncy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura McCollum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikeel Azeem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?