Denton v. Pastor et al
Plaintiff: Michael Denton
Defendant: Pastor, Patti Jackson, Charla James-Hutchison, Caruso, Kathi Miller, S Jones, Andy Powell and A Vancleave
Case Number: 3:2016cv05314
Filed: April 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Presiding Judge: David W. Christel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 269 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND SECOND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (Attachments: # 1 Transcript of Pretrial Conference held 10/19/18, # 2 Vacated Order of Dismissal dated 10/19/18). (JL)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER (18-36000) Revoking In Forma Pauperis Status re the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals 256 Referral Notice signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (cc: 9th CCA)**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(GMR)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice, signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. All pending motions are stricken (Dkts. 234 , 243 ). **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(GMR)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to strike inadmissible witness requested by the defendants in Defendants['] Pretrial[sic] Statement pursuant to LRC (I) (Dkt # 229 ) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan.**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(CMG)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 228 Motion for Reconsideration of the 223 Order denying without prejudice the motion to allow Michelle Walker to testify at trial and other motions. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan.**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(CMG)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 225 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING 221 MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Judge Robert J. Bryan; Noting Date 8/31/2018. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610) (TC)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Plaintiff's 215 Motion to Allow Disciplinary Hearings Program Administrator Michelle Walker to Testify at Trial is Denied without Prejudice; Plaintiff's 214 Motion to Request that Defendants Appear by Video Teleconference for Trial is Denied; and Plaintiff's 214 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED. **6 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(GMR)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 212 Motions in Limine, signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(GMR)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER denying 203 Motion to allow Disciplinary Hearings Officer Mark Knighton to testify at trial, signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan.**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(CMG)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER ON MOTIONS by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Plaintiff's 196 Motion to Continue Scheduling Order Dates for Trail [sic] IS GRANTED; Trial IS RESET to begin on October 29, 2018, at 9:00 a.m.; and Plaintiff's 198 Motio n to Request Bench Trail [sic] without a Jury IS DENIED; Plaintiff's 198 Motion for Appointment of Counsel IS DENIED; and Plaintiff's Emergency 204 Motion for Temporary Restraining order and Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to issue a scheduling order resetting any pending pre-trial deadlines. **6 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(GMR)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER Denying 195 Motion to set settlement conference to accept defendants' offer, signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(GMR)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER by Judge Robert J. Bryan on Plaintiff's Response/Objection to R&R Ordering Trial by Video Teleconference in a Jury Trial. Plaintiff's 197 Motion for Reconsideration IS DENIED; the May 30, 2018 194 Order denying Plaintiff's writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum IS AFFIRMED; and Plaintiff's 197 Application for Court Appointed Counsel IS DENIED. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(GMR)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan on Plaintiff's Motion for Subpoena Forms, and Petitions for Writs of Habeas Corpus Testificandum. Plaintiff's 170 Motion Requesting Four Subpoena Forms to Call Four Pierce County Employees to be W itnesses at Trial is GRANTED; the Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff four subpoena forms with the employee names filled out. Plaintiff's 171 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum for Michael Denton is DENIED; and Plaintiff' ;s 172 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum re Oscar Sanabria is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena form- Ake, # 2 Subpoena form- Sandoval, # 3 Subpoena form- Earp, # 4 Subpoena form- Herbison)**20 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(GMR)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER that U.S. Magistrate Judge J. Richard Creatura IS APPOINTED as a settlement judgment judge for this case, pursuant to Local Rule 39.1(e), and that Plaintiff's 168 Motion to Appoint Mediator IS DENIED WIHTOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(CMG)(cc to Mag Judge Creatura)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER that Plaintiff's 163 Motion to Request Copy of the Declaration of Robert Dean Griffin IS GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion to Strike/Remove Fraudulent Document 161 IS GRANTED. The Report and Recommendation of Magistrate J udge David W Christel 155 IS ADOPTED: Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (Dkt. 133) IS DENIED. Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. 139) IS DENIED as to Plaintiff's due process claim regarding the revocation of good time credits and GRANTED in all other respects. ON or before January 26, 2018, the parties SHALL EACH FILE a proposed case schedule, indicating what matters remain to be addressed before trial, and trial dates. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Dean Griffin)**10 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(CMG)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER that the Report and Recommendation 155 IS RENOTED for December 29, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(CMG)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER denying the 129 Motion to set Settlement Scheduling Order for both parties to meet. The parties are instructed to refrain form filing any settlement offers with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(CMG)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 131 Report and Recommendations, by Judge Robert J. Bryan. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(DK)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER denying 104 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing; denying 108 Second Motion for Evidentiary Hearing; denying 111 Motion to Consolidate Cases; and denying 121 Motion to Review Jail Conditions, signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel.**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(CMG)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER that the Report and Recommendation 102 IS ADOPTED; Plaintiff's motions for temporary restraining order (Dkts. 52 and 65) ARE DENIED; and this case IS RE-REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Christel for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(CMG)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME, by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Pltf's "Motion to Extend Any and All Response Dates to Respond to Any All Deadlines" (Dkt. 107), is GRANTED. The Report and Recommendation (Dkt. 102), is RENOTED to 7/14/17. Any supplemental objections are DUE by 7/7/17; response to supplemental objections DUE 7/14/17. Pltf's pending motions (Dkts. 104, 106, 108, 109, and 121) and Dfts Motion to Consolidate (Dkt. 111), are RENOTED to 8/14/17. Any further motions filed in this case shall be noted no earlier than August 4, 2017. **6 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(DK)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. The following Motions are DENIED: 80 Motion for funds, 85 Motion for funds, and 89 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's 86 Motion to Amend is GRANTED; the second amended complaint is due 5/12/2017. The Motions for Temporary Restraining Order ( 52 , 65 , 72 ) are re-noted for 5/12/2017. (GMR- cc: pltf w/forms)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND DECLINING TO ADOPT IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 61 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) Paper copy sent to plaintiff @ Tacoma address . Modified on 2/16/2017 (JL).
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Denying 45 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610) (GMR)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER adopting 41 Report and Recommendations by Judge Robert J. Bryan. S Jones, Kathi Miller, Andy Powell, R Vancleave, B Davis and Patti Jackson terminated. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610)(MET)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief is denied as moot. **1 PAGE, PRINT ALL** (Michael Denton, Prisoner ID: 898610) (GMR)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING APPEAL, denying 12 .Plaintiff;s Motion to Appeal Order Denying Plaintiff's Application for Court Appointed Counsel (Dkt. 12) IS DENIED. The Order of the U.S. Magistrate denying the Plaintiff's Application for Court Appointed Counsel (Dkt. 7) IS AFFIRMED. The pleading entitled, "Order to Show Cause for an [sic] Preliminary Injunction & a Temporary Restraining Order" (Dkt. 12-2), and the remainder of this case, IS RE-REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) Paper copy sen to plaintiff at Tacoma address . Modified on 6/14/2016 (JL).
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 8 Motion for Leave to Filed an Amended Complaint; by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is due by 7/13/2016; failure to timely file an amended complaint will result in the Court proceeding on Plaintiff's 4 Complaint. (GMR- cc: ptlf w/forms)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denton v. Pastor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pastor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patti Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charla James-Hutchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathi Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Vancleave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?