July 8, 2021 |
Filing
234
ORDER granting the parties' 233 Stipulated Motion for Order of Dismissal. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant in this action are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
|
January 6, 2021 |
Filing
230
SCHEDULING ORDER re 229 Joint Status Report. **3 DAYS** Jury Trial is set for 12/13/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13206 before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez Settlement Conference per LCR 39.1(c)(2) to be held no later than by 9/1/2021, Motions in Limine due by 11/15/2021, Agreed Pretrial Order due by 12/1/2021, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 12/10/2021. Signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (PM)
|
November 25, 2020 |
Filing
228
ORDER DENYING 226 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL AND ORDERING JOINT STATUS REPORT by December 23, 2020, signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. The docket and case caption have been updated to reflect that defendants other than defendant Rhonda Williamson, who has been substituted for deceased defendant Joe Williamson, have been terminated from this matter (see Dkts. 131 , 225 ). (KMC)
|
September 14, 2020 |
Filing
225
ORDER ADOPTING 219 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion (Dkt. # 199 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. All claims are dismissed with prejudice except the § 1983 claim that Joe Williamson retaliated against Plaintiff. Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. # 211 ) is DENIED as untimely. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (MW)
|
April 27, 2020 |
Filing
214
ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. Defendants' brief is due on or before May 12, 2020, and plaintiff's brief is due on or before May 26, 2020. The Clerk shall re-note the pending summary judgment motions (Dkts. 199 , 211 ) for consideration on May 26, 2020. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Asher Becker, Prisoner ID: 325267)(GMR)
|
July 23, 2019 |
Filing
198
ORDER granting 194 Motion to Reopen Discovery and Set a New Dispositive Motion Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. Discovery is re-opened until September 23, 2019 and any dispositive motions shall be filed on or before October 23, 2019. Plaintiff's request 190 for the appointment of counsel is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. **7 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Asher Becker, Prisoner ID: 325267) (ERA)
|
March 26, 2018 |
Filing
170
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 163 Objections to Report and Recommendation, and 166 Motion to Amend, filed by Asher James Becker; Defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED and this action is DISMISSED; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Asher Becker, Prisoner ID: 325267)(DN)
|
January 12, 2018 |
Filing
159
ORDER granting 154 Motion to file supplemental records. The Court will take note of the additional records plaintiff has filed. Defendants' request in their response ((Dkt !57) is also granted. The Clerk is directed to place plaintiff's motion to file supplemental records under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Asher Becker, Prisoner ID: 325267)(CMG)
|
December 27, 2017 |
Filing
156
ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's 143 Motion to Amend; and denying as moot Plaintiff's 145 Motion to Produce Video, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Asher Becker, Prisoner ID: 325267)(CMG)
|
December 1, 2017 |
Filing
149
ORDER denying 109 Motion to Produce records, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Asher Becker, Prisoner ID: 325267)(CMG)
|
November 22, 2017 |
Filing
148
ORDER denying 138 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, and denying 144 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended response within the proper page limits on or before 12/11/17. The Clerk is directed to re-note Defendants' 110 MOTION for Summary Judgment to 12/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Asher Becker, Prisoner ID: 325267)(CMG)
|
September 26, 2017 |
Filing
132
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 101 Motion for Cost Bill, and Plaintiff's 102 Motion to Compel. The Court orders that defendants show cause why the Court should not order them to facilitate plaintiff's viewing of the documents curren tly being held in the mail room on or before October 24, 2017. Plaintiff may file a response by November 14, 2017. The Clerk is directed to re-note Plaintiff's 109 MOTION for Order to Produce Records to November 17, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.**5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Asher Becker, Prisoner ID: 325267)(CMG)
|
August 14, 2017 |
Filing
125
AMENDED ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura re 124 Order. The Amended Order amends only the date on which the motion to substitute is due. The deadline for filing a motion for substitution expires on October 23, 2017.**4 PAGES, PRINT ALL**(Asher Becker, Prisoner ID: 325267)(GMR)
|
August 11, 2017 |
Filing
124
ORDER that Plaintiff's motion regarding Williamson discovery is denied without prejudice. All other motions, including request made in plaintiff's response are denied with prejudice. (Dkts. 95 and 121 . The 90 day window for a motio n for substitution began on July 24, 2017. Therefore, the deadline for filing a motion for substitution expires on November 8, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Asher Becker, Prisoner ID: 325267)(CMG)
|
July 17, 2017 |
Filing
100
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 96 granting Plaintiff's Motion 92 to dismiss Defendants McCarty, Parker, Harmon, and Armbruster, without prejudice; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Asher Becker, Prisoner ID: 325267)(DN)
|
May 31, 2017 |
Filing
93
ORDER denying 91 Defendants' Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order 86 ; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Asher Becker, Prisoner ID: 325267)(DN)
|
January 19, 2017 |
Filing
56
ORDER by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura Granting Plaintiff's 40 Motion for Personal Service on Defendant Williamson/WA DOC; and Directing Personal Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Joe Williamson by the United States Marshal. **6 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Asher Becker, Prisoner ID: 325267)(GMR)
|
January 5, 2017 |
Filing
51
ORDER ON SERVERAL MOTIONS by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. - Plaintiff's 43 Motion to Identify "CRC Member Pat Doe #1" and Serve Defendant Sara Smith is DENIED AS MOOT. - Plaintiff's 47 Motion for Extension o f Time is GRANTED, as requested. - Plaintiff's 44 Motion to Amend Complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ordered to file an amended complaint on or before January 30, 2017 that is legible, clear, and dark enough that it can be scanned and entered into the Court's electronic filing system. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Asher Becker, Prisoner ID: 325267)(GMR)
|
December 14, 2016 |
Filing
49
ORDER ON SERVERAL MOTIONS by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. Plaintiff's 39 Motion for Court to provide information re: service is Denied as Moot; Plaintiffs request for a sixty-day extension of the deadline to effect service is Granted; Plaintiff's 40 MOTION for Personal Service is re-noted for 2/13/2017; and the DOC is directed to Show Cause by 1/13/2017. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Asher Becker, Prisoner ID: 325267)(GMR)
|
July 1, 2016 |
Filing
10
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Asher James Becker; IFP motion is DENIED as moot as filing fee paid; Plaintiff objection 9 to the show cause order is also DENIED as moot; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Asher Becker, Prisoner ID: 325267)(DN)
|
May 24, 2016 |
Filing
6
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE COMPLAINT signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Asher Becker, Prisoner ID: 325267)(MET)
|
May 2, 2016 |
Filing
4
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Asher James Becker; signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. Show Cause Response or Filing Fee due by 6/3/2016. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Asher Becker, Prisoner ID: 325267)(CMG)
|