Goodall v. Hatch et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Goodall
Defendant: Hatch, K Adams, McMains, Jeffrey Rude, Maggie Miller-Stout and Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2016cv05342
Filed: May 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Grays Harbor
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 53 Defendants' motion for summary 34 is GRANTED and plaintiff's complaint is dismissed; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 6/12/2017 (DN). (cc to pltf)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying 28 Motion for Discovery signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. Defendants are ordered to respond to the request for production and interrogatories directed at defendant Rude within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.(MET) cc: plaintiff
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge J Richard Creatura. Plaintiffs motion for voluntary dismissal without prejudice (Dkt. 21) and amended motion for voluntary dismissal without prejudice (Dkt. 22) are denied as moot. Plaintiffs motion to clarify and not dismiss (Dkt. 24) is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs motion to respond to document numbers 19, 20, and 23 (Dkt. 25) is denied.**5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Samuel Goodall, Prisoner ID: 726826)(MET)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by Judge J Richard Creatura. Mailed 1st Class on 5/23/2016 to Defendants & AG. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Samuel Goodall, Prisoner ID: 726826)(MET) cc: plaintiff w/pro se sheet
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodall v. Hatch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Goodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McMains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Rude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maggie Miller-Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?