Wilson v. Pierce County et al
Plaintiff: Gabriel Wilson
Defendant: Pierce County, Pierce County Jail, John Doe, Jane Doe, Steve Carver and Kristin Berres
Case Number: 3:2016cv05455
Filed: June 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER ON THE PARTIES' STATUS REPORTS: All claims DISMISSED. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (TC)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER ON DEFENDANT PIERCE COUNTY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, granting 48 . Parties SHALL FILE a status report, on or before September 22, 2017, informing the Court which claims, if any, remain for trial. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) Paper copy sent to Toleafoa @ Clallam Bay address . Modified on 9/5/2017 (JL).
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ON THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT NAITALLII JEOVAN TOLEAFOA'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL, denying 29 . Third Party Defendant Toleafoa may provide the court information re: his criminal case by 11/25/16. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) (Main Document 34 replaced on 10/27/2016) (JL). Paper copy sent to TPD Toleafoa at Clallam Bay address . Modified on 10/27/2016 (JL).
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ON SECOND MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint by 9/9/16. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Pierce County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Wilson
Represented By: James Bible
Represented By: Aaron Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce County
Represented By: Brent J Hyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce County Jail
Represented By: Brent J Hyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Carver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Berres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?