Comenout et al v Pierce County Superior Court et al
Plaintiff: Robert Reginald Comenout, Sr., Edward Amos Comenout, III, Robert E Kovacevich, Robert Reginald Comenout, Jr., Marlene Comenout and Lee A Comenout, Sr
Defendant: Pierce County Superior Court, Boyd Goodpaster, J. Mark Keller, Lee Boling, Washington State Liquor and Cannabis Control Board, Washington State Department of Revenue, Joshua Choate, Michael Pellicciotti and John and Jane Does
Case Number: 3:2016cv05464
Filed: June 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT KANDRA TINNERSTET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, granting 126 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant Kandra Tinnerstet is DISMISSED. There being no other remaining defendants, this matter is closed. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan.(JL)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER ON DEFENDANT ERIC BELIN'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, granting 115 Motion for Summary Judgment.Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER ON DEFENDANT PAUL W. JOHNSON'S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(1), AND (6), granting in part and denying in part 103 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 65 Motion to Dismiss. The case is dismissed without prejudice as to a motion for leave to amend only. Any motion for leave to amend shall be filed before June 1, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING THE STATE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, denying 49 . Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ON (1) DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND (2) PLAINTIFFS' COUNTER MOTION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, granting 33 & denying 35 . Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON JUDICIAL AND PROSECUTORIAL DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FRCP 12(B)(1) AND 12(B)(6), granting 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Judicial and Prosecutorial Defendants are HEREBY DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Comenout et al v Pierce County Superior Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Reginald Comenout, Sr.
Represented By: Randal Bruce Brown
Represented By: Robert E Kovacevich
Represented By: Aaron Lee Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Amos Comenout, III
Represented By: Randal Bruce Brown
Represented By: Robert E Kovacevich
Represented By: Aaron Lee Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E Kovacevich
Represented By: Randal Bruce Brown
Represented By: Robert E Kovacevich
Represented By: Aaron Lee Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Reginald Comenout, Jr.
Represented By: Randal Bruce Brown
Represented By: Robert E Kovacevich
Represented By: Aaron Lee Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Comenout
Represented By: Randal Bruce Brown
Represented By: Robert E Kovacevich
Represented By: Aaron Lee Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee A Comenout, Sr
Represented By: Randal Bruce Brown
Represented By: Robert E Kovacevich
Represented By: Aaron Lee Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyd Goodpaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Mark Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Boling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Liquor and Cannabis Control Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Choate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Pellicciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?