Roosma et al v. Pierce County et al

Plaintiff: Justin Roosma and Elizabeth Roosma
Defendant: Pierce County, Paul Pastor, Patti Jackson-Kidder, Correct Care Solutions LLC and Does 1-500
Case Number: 3:2016cv05499
Filed: June 17, 2016
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order 154 ORDER ON PIERCE COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, granting in part and denying in part 102 Motion for Summary Judgment and striking as moot 120 Motion in Limine; 123 Motion in Limine; striking 128 Motion in Limine; & 135 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The case is HEREBY REMANDED to the Pierce County Superior Court re: the state law cross-claim of Pierce County Defendants against Defendant CCS. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order 127 ORDER granting in part 90 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 109 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order 76 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY CUTOFF, granting in part 70 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery completed by 12/15/2017, Dispositive motions due by 1/4/2018. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order 62 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion to Compel; granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order 29 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roosma et al v. Pierce County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Roosma
Represented By: Lawrence A Hildes
Represented By: Gregory Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Roosma
Represented By: Lawrence A Hildes
Represented By: Gregory Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Pastor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patti Jackson-Kidder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-500
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?