Bakke v. Topaum
Plaintiff: Jeremy Putnam Bakke
Defendant: Tom Topaum
Case Number: 3:2016cv05598
Filed: July 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Grays Harbor
Presiding Judge: David W. Christel
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 43 granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 2/24/2017 (DN). (cc to pltf)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 32 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Jeremy Putnam Bakke; Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 20 is DENIED; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 12/20/2016 (DN). (cc to pltf)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 14 Plaintiff's Motion for default and default judgment 11 is denied; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jeremy Bakke, Prisoner ID: 737768)(DN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bakke v. Topaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Putnam Bakke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Topaum
Represented By: Sara E Baynard-Cooke
Represented By: Daniel G Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?