Ballard Marine Construction, Inc. v. EHW Constructors et al
Plaintiff: Ballard Marine Construction, Inc.
Defendant: EHW Constructors, Skanska USA Civil Inc., American Bridge Company and Nova Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv05633
Filed: July 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER denying 96 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order; the parties have 21 calendar days from the date of this Order to conduct any remaining depositions; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER denying 82 Defendant's Motion to Exclude; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 36 Joint Stipulated Motion to Seal Controlled Nuclear Information and Order Thereon; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying 15 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; plaintiff has 21 days to file an Amended Complaint; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ballard Marine Construction, Inc. v. EHW Constructors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ballard Marine Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Andrew Brown
Represented By: Meredith E Dishaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EHW Constructors
Represented By: John P Ahlers
Represented By: James R Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skanska USA Civil Inc.
Represented By: John P Ahlers
Represented By: James R Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bridge Company
Represented By: John P Ahlers
Represented By: James R Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nova Group, Inc.
Represented By: John P Ahlers
Represented By: James R Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?