Nelson v. US Federal Marshal's Service et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Weldon Nelson, Jr
Defendant: US Federal Marshal's Service, US Government, Safeco Insurance and Kitsap Co. Sheriff
Case Number: 3:2016cv05680
Filed: August 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Kitsap
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER ADOPTING AND MODIFYING 112 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 113 Objections, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Defendants' 89 Motion for Summary Judgment is Granted. (GMR)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 88 Stipulated Motion to Seal; signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. The Clerk will update the docket to reflect that Dkt. 94 will remain under seal unless there is further order of the Court. (SP)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 58 Report and Recommendations. (TG)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 48 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Patrick W Nelson. (TG)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Amend by Judge J Richard Creatura. The Clerk is directed to docket the Proposed First Amended Answer (Dkt. 33 at 7-17) as defendants First Amended Answer to plaintiffs complaint.(MET)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 26 Motion to Stay; denying 24 Motion to Strike signed by Judge J Richard Creatura.(MET)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 17 Report and Recommendations. (TG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. US Federal Marshal's Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Weldon Nelson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Federal Marshal's Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kitsap Co. Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?