Gilmer v. Centene Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Gilmer and Linda Gilmer
Defendant: Centene Corporation, Centene Management Company, LLC and Coordinated Care Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv05685
Filed: August 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1514 a
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(TG)
March 15, 2017 Filing 41 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Linda Gilmer, TO RESPONSE to #39 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice (Wing, Jesse)
March 13, 2017 Filing 40 RESPONSE, by Defendants Centene Corporation, Centene Management Company, LLC, Coordinated Care Corporation, to #39 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice. (Bakker, Bradley)
February 17, 2017 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice, filed by Plaintiff Linda Gilmer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/17/2017, (Wing, Jesse)
February 15, 2017 Filing 38 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Linda Gilmer (Wing, Jesse)
February 15, 2017 Filing 37 STATUS REPORT by Defendants Centene Corporation, Centene Management Company, LLC, Coordinated Care Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Martell, Breanne)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER on the #35 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Lewis Galloway on behalf of Linda Gilmer, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(GMR)
December 20, 2016 Filing 35 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lewis Galloway FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Linda Gilmer (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4711002 (Wing, Jesse)
December 20, 2016 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jesse Andrew Wing on behalf of Plaintiff Linda Gilmer. (Wing, Jesse)
December 20, 2016 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Centene Corporation.(Martell, Breanne)
December 20, 2016 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Centene Management Company, LLC.(Martell, Breanne)
December 20, 2016 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Coordinated Care Corporation.(Martell, Breanne)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting #29 Stipulated Motion to extend initial case scheduling deadlines: Defendants answer due by 1/11/2017, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/25/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/8/2017, Joint Status Report due by 2/15/2017.(TG)
December 19, 2016 Filing 29 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Initial Case Scheduling Deadlines by Defendants Centene Corporation, Centene Management Company, LLC, Coordinated Care Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/19/2016, (Martell, Breanne)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/10/2017, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/20/2016, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/3/2017, by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG; copies of initial orders mailed to plaintiff's counsel)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER on the #24 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jovita Foster as counsel for Defendants, signed by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CMG)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER on the #23 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Bradley M Bakker as counsel for Defendants, signed by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CMG)
August 16, 2016 Filing 24 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jovita Foster FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Centene Corporation, Centene Management Company, LLC, Coordinated Care Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4565834 (Martell, Breanne)
August 16, 2016 Filing 23 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Bradley M. Bakker FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Centene Corporation, Centene Management Company, LLC, Coordinated Care Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4565821 (Martell, Breanne)
August 15, 2016 Attorney Douglas Edward Smith for Centene Corporation, Centene Management Company, LLC, Coordinated Care Corporation added per #22 Notice of Appearance. (MET)
August 12, 2016 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Breanne Sheetz Martell on behalf of Defendants Centene Corporation, Centene Management Company, LLC, Coordinated Care Corporation. (Martell, Breanne)
August 5, 2016 Filing 21 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from the Western District of Missouri and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CMG)
August 5, 2016 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western, Case Number 4:16-cv-00402; all documents received electronically.
August 5, 2016 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (CMG)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, to Transfer. This case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington. The Clerk of this Court shall affect the transfer to the Western District of Washington upon the entry of this Order. Signed on August 3, 2016 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Moore, Terri) [Transferred from mowd on 8/5/2016.]
July 28, 2016 Filing 18 STIPULATION re #10 MOTION to dismiss case for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by Linda Gilmer. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Galloway, Lewis) [Transferred from mowd on 8/5/2016.]
July 20, 2016 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Bradley M. Bakker on behalf of Defendant Coordinated Care Corporation.(Bakker, Bradley) [Transferred from mowd on 8/5/2016.]
July 20, 2016 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Bradley M. Bakker on behalf of Defendant Centene Management Company, LLC.(Bakker, Bradley) [Transferred from mowd on 8/5/2016.]
July 20, 2016 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Bradley M. Bakker on behalf of Defendant Centene Corporation.(Bakker, Bradley) [Transferred from mowd on 8/5/2016.]
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 motion for extension of time to file suggestions in opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss #10 .Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/28/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 7/15/16 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Mitchell, Lisa) [Transferred from mowd on 8/5/2016.]
July 15, 2016 Filing 13 MOTION for extension of time to Submit Suggestions in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Lewis M Galloway on behalf of Linda Gilmer. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/1/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Galloway, Lewis) [Transferred from mowd on 8/5/2016.]
July 6, 2016 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) [Transferred from mowd on 8/5/2016.]
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Rule 16 Notice. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/19/2016. Rule 26 conference due by 8/9/2016. Signed on 7/5/16 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa) [Transferred from mowd on 8/5/2016.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 11 SUGGESTIONS in support re #10 MOTION to dismiss case for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Bradley M. Bakker on behalf of Defendants Centene Corporation, Centene Management Company, LLC, Coordinated Care Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Bakker, Bradley) [Transferred from mowd on 8/5/2016.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 10 MOTION to dismiss case for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Bradley M. Bakker on behalf of Centene Corporation, Centene Management Company, LLC, Coordinated Care Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/18/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Bakker, Bradley) [Transferred from mowd on 8/5/2016.]
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 motion for extension of time to file answer. Defendants' answers due 7/1/16. Signed on 6/6/16 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Mitchell, Lisa) [Transferred from mowd on 8/5/2016.]
June 6, 2016 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 6/3/2016 as Document No. 7-1, Exhibit A (Proposed Order). The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word or WordPerfect format. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Houston, Kiambu) [Transferred from mowd on 8/5/2016.]
June 3, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Jovita Foster on behalf of Centene Corporation, Centene Management Company, LLC, Coordinated Care Corporation (Attorney Jovita Foster added to party Centene Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Jovita Foster added to party Centene Management Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jovita Foster added to party Coordinated Care Corporation(pty:dft))(Foster, Jovita) [Transferred from mowd on 8/5/2016.]
June 3, 2016 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time filed by Bradley M. Bakker on behalf of Centene Corporation, Centene Management Company, LLC, Coordinated Care Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/20/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bakker, Bradley) [Transferred from mowd on 8/5/2016.]
June 3, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Bradley M. Bakker on behalf of Centene Corporation, Centene Management Company, LLC, Coordinated Care Corporation (Attorney Bradley M. Bakker added to party Centene Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley M. Bakker added to party Centene Management Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley M. Bakker added to party Coordinated Care Corporation(pty:dft))(Bakker, Bradley) [Transferred from mowd on 8/5/2016.]
May 26, 2016 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Linda Gilmer. Coordinated Care Corporation served on 5/12/2016, answer due 6/2/2016. (Galloway, Lewis) [Transferred from mowd on 8/5/2016.]
May 26, 2016 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Linda Gilmer. Centene Management Company, LLC served on 5/12/2016, answer due 6/2/2016. (Galloway, Lewis) [Transferred from mowd on 8/5/2016.]
May 26, 2016 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Linda Gilmer. Centene Corporation served on 5/12/2016, answer due 6/2/2016. (Galloway, Lewis) [Transferred from mowd on 8/5/2016.]
May 11, 2016 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Centene Corporation, Centene Management Company, LLC, Coordinated Care Corporation. (Martin, Jan) [Transferred from mowd on 8/5/2016.]
May 6, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Houston, Kiambu) [Transferred from mowd on 8/5/2016.]
May 6, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Lewis M Galloway on behalf of Linda Gilmer. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0866-4818651. Service due by 8/8/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USDOL Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Galloway, Lewis) [Transferred from mowd on 8/5/2016.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilmer v. Centene Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Gilmer
Represented By: Lewis Galloway
Represented By: Jesse Andrew Wing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centene Corporation
Represented By: Breanne Sheetz Martell
Represented By: Jovita Foster
Represented By: Bradley M Bakker
Represented By: Douglas Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centene Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Breanne Sheetz Martell
Represented By: Jovita Foster
Represented By: Bradley M Bakker
Represented By: Douglas Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coordinated Care Corporation
Represented By: Breanne Sheetz Martell
Represented By: Jovita Foster
Represented By: Bradley M Bakker
Represented By: Douglas Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?