Scott v. Van Hook
Plaintiff: Richard Roy Scott
Defendant: Van Hook
Case Number: 3:2016cv05785
Filed: September 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: David W. Christel
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 95 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Richard Roy Scott; Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED; Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 1/2/2018 (DN). (cc to pltf)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 86 DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 11/17/2017 (DN). (cc to pltf)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER STAYING CASE, by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. This case is stayed in the interests of justice and judicial economy and efficiency. Plaintiff's pending Motions (Dkt. 45 , 49 , 50 ) are denied without prejudice. Motions will not be considered by the Court during the stay. (GMR- cc: pltf)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel Denying Plaintiff's 36 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; Plaintiff's 42 Motion to Conduct Deposition; and Plaintiff's 41 Request for Sanctions. (GMR- cc: pltf)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 30 Motion to Re-note Motions, by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. (GMR- cc: pltf)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 27 DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for TRO Medical Services; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 1/6/2017 (DN). (cc to pltf)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 22 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Richard Roy Scott; Plaintiff's Motion for TRO 8 is DENIED without prejudice; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 12/20/2016 (DN). (cc to pltf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Van Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Roy Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Hook
Represented By: Craig B Mingay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?