McGraw v. GEICO General Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Yolanda McGraw
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv05876
Filed: October 13, 2016
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2017 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 63 Motion to Stay; granting 64 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages & denying 65 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
April 18, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Strike as Moot by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG)
March 13, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting 51 Motion to Stay; granting 52 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; 53 MOTION for Reconsideration re 49 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Remand: RENOTED to 3/24/2017.(TG)
February 27, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle finding as moot 39 Motion to strike; granting 19 Motion to Remand. Per LCR 3(h), case will be remanded 14 days from date of this Order, on 3/13/2017. (TG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGraw v. GEICO General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephanie L Bloomfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda McGraw
Represented By: Stephen M Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?