Bent v Lashway, et al
Plaintiff: Michael S Bent
Defendant: Patricia Lashway, Mark Greenberg, Mark McCauley and Greg Kimsey
Case Number: 3:2016cv05916
Filed: October 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle denying 58 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 68 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 76 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 82 Motion for Summary Judgment. Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of defendants and close the case. (TG)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion for pretrial conference. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/22/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/29/2017, Joint Status Report due by 10/6/2017.(TG)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle denying as moot 45 Motion to Dismiss; denying 46 Motion to Dismiss; Amanda Barlow (in her official capacity as Acting Assistant Secretary for the Administration for Children and Families) terminated. (TG)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING 24 Motion for More Definite Statement & 25 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff has until 3/3/2017 to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying 16 Motion for TRO by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(TG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bent v Lashway, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S Bent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Lashway
Represented By: Kenneth Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Greenberg
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark McCauley
Represented By: Christopher Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Kimsey
Represented By: Christopher Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?