Fennell v. Pacific Maritime Association et al
Plaintiff: Shiquan Fennell
Defendant: Pacific Maritime Association and International Longshore & Warehouse Union, Local 19
Case Number: 3:2016cv05933
Filed: November 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 38:4323
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL with Prejudice re parties' 104 Stipulation, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER for two-day extension of filing deadline for dispositive motions re parties' 90 Stipulated Motion; Dispositive motions due by 1/4/2018, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting Defendant's 82 Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike re 79 Reply to Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court will consider defendant's response to plaintiff's evidentiary objections when ruling on the pending motion for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 56 Motion to Compel Discovery, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 44 Motion to Dismiss, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 42 Motion to Extend Deadline for Joining Parties; Joinder of Parties deadline EXTENDED to 6/5/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 33 Stipulated Motion Regarding Withdrawal of Pending Motions and Filing of Second Amended Complaint, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Motions 23 , 24 and 27 are withdrawn. Second Amended Complaint due by 2/17/17. Defendants' answer or other response to Second Amended Complaint due by 3/10/17. (KERR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fennell v. Pacific Maritime Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shiquan Fennell
Represented By: James Walter Beck
Represented By: Janelle Ellen Chase Fazio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Maritime Association
Represented By: Jeffrey P Chicoine
Represented By: Kellen Andrew Hade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Longshore & Warehouse Union, Local 19
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?