Brown v. Morgan et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Tyree Brown
Defendant: Richard Morgan, Bernard E Warner, Scott Frakes, Mike Obenland, Robert Herzog, Roy Gonzalez, Sandra Diimmel, Mary Klepps, Darren Heaward, Mike Holthe, Kurt Grubb, Dreyer, Donald Duncan, Yvette Stubbs, Barbara J Gronseth, Ian Erickson, Fay Nicholas and Sneider
Case Number: 3:2016cv05975
Filed: November 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clallam
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Presiding Judge: Karen L Strombom
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER on REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 87 Plaintiff Brown's remaining claims are DISMISSED; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Gregory Brown, Prisoner ID: 281829)(DN)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 87 Report and Recommendations, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Gregory Brown, Prisoner ID: 281829)(DK)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN DEFENDANTS, DIRECTING SERVICE OF CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT, AND REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 38 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Gregory Tyree Brown by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **8 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Gregory Brown, Prisoner ID: 281829)(DK)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke Substituting Parties re 32 Motion to Substitute. Steve Sinclair is substituted for defendants Bernard Warner and Eldon Vail as an official capacity defendant in plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, for purposes of injunctive and declaratory relief only. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Gregory Brown, Prisoner ID: 281829)(GMR)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 25 Objections to Report and Recommendation, filed by Gregory Tyree Brown; Plaintiff's claims in paragraphs 44-111 of his second amended complaint are DISMISSED with prejudice and without leave to amend. The remaining claims are RE-REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Fricke for further resolution; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Gregory Brown, Prisoner ID: 281829)(DN)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton Granting Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Extension of Time and Plaintiff's 22 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court's prior 20 Order is VACATED. Plaintiff's objections to the 19 Report and Recommendation are due within 10 days of this order. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Gregory Brown, Prisoner ID: 281829)(SP)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 19 DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE paragraphs 44 thru 111 of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint; this matter is referred back to Judge Fricke for further processing; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Gregory Brown, Prisoner ID: 281829)(DN)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Leave to file Amended Complaint or TO SHOW CAUSE why complaint should not be dismissed, signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. Third Amended Complaint or Show Cause Response due by 9/11/2017. **7 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Gregory Brown, Prisoner ID: 281829)(CMG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Morgan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Tyree Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard E Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Obenland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Herzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Diimmel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Klepps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Heaward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Holthe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Grubb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dreyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvette Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara J Gronseth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?