Williams v Berryhill
Plaintiff: Lula Williams
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2016cv06042
Filed: December 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Affirming Commissioner's Decision and Dismissing Case, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING ASIDE ORDER DISMISSING CASE re Plaintiff's 7 MOTION for Relief under Rule 60(b)(1) ; Clerk of Court is directed to reopen the above-captioned matter, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER dismissing case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to provide proof of service or to SHOW CAUSE why this matter should not be dismissed, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Show Cause Response due by 4/25/2017. (Nancy A. Berryhill added. Carolyn W. Colvin terminated.) (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lula Williams
Represented By: Douglas Baier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?