Roise v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Michael Richard Roise
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2017cv05074
Filed: January 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Presiding Judge: Karen L Strombom
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 27 Stipulated Motion for Attorney Fees under the EAJA signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. This matter is REMANDED to the Commissioner for further administrative proceedings in accordance with the findings contained therein. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on the 23 Stipulated MOTION for Remand, signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. Noted for: 9/15/2017. (GMR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roise v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Richard Roise
Represented By: Robert S Allen
Represented By: Nancy J Meserow(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?