Travelers Property Casualty Company of America et al v. Northwest Pipe Company et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America and The Phoenix Insurance Company
Defendant: Northwest Pipe Company and Greater Vancouver Water District
Case Number: 3:2017cv05098
Filed: February 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle Directing the Clerk to (1) remove the 123 Motion for Sanctions from the Court's calendar and (2) strike documents 110 and 112-2 from the record. For purposes of a complete record, NPC shall file a redacted version of documents 110 and 112-2. Regarding further proceedings, the Court finds that a stay is appropriate, and the Clerk is directed to administratively close this matter for purposes of the stay. (GMR)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER denying 102 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment & granting 104 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion to Bifurcate.(TG)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting 26 Motion to Amend (Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint); granting 14 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion for Summary Judgment.(TG)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle denying 21 Motion to Stay; requesting supplemental briefing on issues stated in Order; and RENOTING 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 14 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , and 26 MOTION to Amend 13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, to 7/14/2017.(TG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America et al v. Northwest Pipe Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Represented By: Eric J Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Phoenix Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Represented By: Eric J Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Pipe Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater Vancouver Water District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?