Sutherland v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Kelly Sutherland
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2017cv05166
Filed: March 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: James P. Donohue
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 23 Report and Recommendations, 24 Objections to Report and Recommendation; The final decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED and this case is DISMISSED with prejudice, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Plaintiff why she should not be sanctioned $150 for failure to comply with the Court's prior orders ; striking plaintiff's stipulated motions 12 and 13 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (Second) (Stipulated) ; Show Cause Response due by 7/18/2017, signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. (SWT)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, by Hon. James P. Donohue. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutherland v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Sutherland
Represented By: Karen Gale Stolzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?