1031 Equity Exchange, LLC et al vs Superior Homes, LLC et al
Plaintiff: 1031 Equity Exchange, LLC and Kauai Ocean View Professional Building, LLC
Defendant: Superior Homes, LLC and Estela Mata
Case Number: 3:2017cv05213
Filed: March 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Thurston
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1407 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle vacating previous order 21 Order on Motion to Dismiss; and dismissing complaint for lack of jurisdiction. (TG)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(TG)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Superior Homes, LLC. Show Cause Response due by 6/19/2017. (TG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1031 Equity Exchange, LLC et al vs Superior Homes, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1031 Equity Exchange, LLC
Represented By: Allen T Miller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kauai Ocean View Professional Building, LLC
Represented By: Allen T Miller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Homes, LLC
Represented By: Paul Edward Brain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estela Mata
Represented By: Paul Edward Brain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?