Mason v. Mason
Plaintiff: Tatyana I Mason
Defendant: John A Mason
Case Number: 3:2017cv05289
Filed: April 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Thurston
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 00:0000 Cause Code Unknown
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Dismiss; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Trustee's 34 motion to amend and substitute Trustee as real party in interest. Trustee is now directed to e-file the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(CMG)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying 11 Amended Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying 1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; plaintiff shall pay the filing fee or file an amended complaint within 21 days or the case will be dismissed; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 5/30/2017 (DN). (cc to pltf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason v. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatyana I Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?