Bistryski v. DOC Health Services of Stafford Creek Corrections Center et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Andrew Bistryski
Defendant: DOC Health Services of Stafford Creek Corrections Center, DoC Health Services of Monroe Corrections Center Special Offender Center, S Light, Furst, Casey, Sheryl Allbert, Medical Care Review Committee and Medical Services Sanctioner
Case Number: 3:2017cv05369
Filed: May 17, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Referring Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2018 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 65 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke.**5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Christopher Bistryski, Prisoner ID: 306886)(CMG)
July 13, 2018 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Amended the 32 First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is directed to file a second amended complaint setting forth facts that state a cause of action against each of the defendants, Allbert and Hammond. Plaintiff must file the second amended complaint on or before September 7, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint Form (blank))**8 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Christopher Bistryski, Prisoner ID: 306886)(CMG)
July 10, 2018 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT the 59 Report and Recommendations; and the case IS RE-REFERRED to US Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke for proceedings consistent with this order. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. **9 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Christopher Bistryski, Prisoner ID: 306886)(CMG)
May 11, 2018 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 54 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge Robert J. Bryan, re 55 Objections; and RE-REFERRING this case to U.S. Magistrate Judge Theresa L. Fricke for proceedings consistent with this order.**6 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Christopher Bistryski, Prisoner ID: 306886)(GMR)
April 18, 2018 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re dismissal of defendants Allbert and Hammond. Plaintiff's Show Cause Response is due by 5/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. **7 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Christopher Bistryski, Prisoner ID: 306886)(CMG)
January 9, 2018 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ( 33 , 34 , and 35 ); the Defendants' Motions to Dismiss ( 21 and 23 ) ARE STRICKEN AS MOOT in light of the newly Amended Complaint; and the case IS RE-REFERRED to U.S. Magistr ate Judge Theresa L Fricke for proceedings consistent with this order. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Christopher Bistryski, Prisoner ID: 306886)(CMG) Modified on 1/10/2018: add hyperlink to Dkt nos. #21, 23, and 34. (CMG).
August 30, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 7 Motion for the Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Christopher Bistryski, Prisoner ID: 306886) (GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bistryski v. DOC Health Services of Stafford Creek Corrections Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Andrew Bistryski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOC Health Services of Stafford Creek Corrections Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DoC Health Services of Monroe Corrections Center Special Offender Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Light
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl Allbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Care Review Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Services Sanctioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?