Griffin v. Herzog et al
Plaintiff: Robert Dean Griffin
Defendant: Robert Herzog, Dan White, Fernelius, Steve Hammond, Delp, S Gedney, Dean, G Robbins, Mortinson and Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2017cv05394
Filed: May 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Mason
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 77 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Robert Dean Griffin, 78 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Robert Dean Griffin; Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Griffin, Prisoner ID: 851075)(DN)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER denying 67 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Griffin, Prisoner ID: 851075)(CMG)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER that Defendants' 19 Motion for More Definite Statement is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's 21 Cross-Motion for More Definite Statement is DENIED. **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS**. Plaintiff's motions for default judgment (Dkt s. 40 and 41 ) are DENIED. The Clerk is directed to re-note Plaintiff's 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for 9/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke.**6 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Griffin, Prisoner ID: 851075)(CMG)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 29 Motion for Default and denying 30 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Griffin, Prisoner ID: 851075)(CMG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Herzog et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Dean Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Herzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Gedney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?