LePine v. Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Deborah LePine
Defendant: Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv05483
Filed: June 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Thurston
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #24 Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS** Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (SP) Modified on 1/3/2019 to reflect correct judge. (MGC).
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #19 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Award, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. IT IS SO ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED. (SP) Modified on 1/3/2019 to reflect correct judge. (MGC).
November 2, 2018 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Norman Alcantara filed by Plaintiff Deborah LePine re #24 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Copley, T)
November 2, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement , filed by Plaintiff Deborah LePine. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/9/2018, (Copley, T)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER: This case is referred to the Honorable Benjamin H. Settle for the purposes of conducting the Final Approval/Fairness Hearing scheduled for 11/9/18 at 9:30 a.m. Entered as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK)
October 16, 2018 REFERRING #19 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Award to: Judge Benjamin H. Settle (DK)
September 24, 2018 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Deborah LePine filed by Plaintiff Deborah LePine re #19 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Award (Copley, T)
September 24, 2018 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Julian Hammond filed by Plaintiff Deborah LePine re #19 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Award (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Copley, T)
September 24, 2018 Filing 20 DECLARATION of T. David Copley filed by Plaintiff Deborah LePine re #19 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Award (Copley, T)
September 24, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Award, filed by Plaintiff Deborah LePine. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/9/2018, (Copley, T)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement: Class Counsel to file memorandum of points and authorities in support of approval of fees and expenses by 9/24/18, Class Counsel to file memorandum of points and authorities in support of Settlement Agreement by 11/2/18, settlement approval fairness hearing scheduled for 11/9/18 at 9:30 a.m.; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
July 17, 2018 Filing 17 DECLARATION of T. David Copley filed by Plaintiff Deborah LePine re #16 Unopposed MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Copley, T)
July 17, 2018 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof, filed by Plaintiff Deborah LePine. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/17/2018, (Copley, T)
May 15, 2018 Plaintiff's counsel advised the court this case has settled. A deadline for 60 days to commence filing of dismissal paperwork will be set by the clerk. (DK)
May 15, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Initial filings of Dismissal/Settlement papers due by 7/17/2018. (DK)
November 9, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Case Management deadline 4/2/2018. Check on case status re mediation per JSR Dkt #15. (DK)
October 9, 2017 Filing 15 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: N/A. Filed by Plaintiff Deborah LePine.(Hammond, Julian)
September 15, 2017 Reset Deadlines: Per Counsel's request, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/25/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/2/2017, Joint Status Report due by 10/9/2017, (DN)
August 28, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Emily R. Cardenas on behalf of Defendant Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.. (Cardenas, Emily)
August 25, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #12 Answer to Complaint filed on 8/25/2017 was improperly signed by Emily Rose Cardenas. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 11 and LCR 83.2(a), signatures must comply with Section III(L) of the Electronic Filing Procedures, which states, "An electronically filed pleading or other document which requires an attorney's signature must have the signors' names printed or typed on the line and under all signature lines." (KB)
August 25, 2017 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Unpaid Wages, Exemplary Damages and Declaratory Relief by Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc..(Smith, Douglas)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Stipulated Motion to Stay Filing of Motion for Class Certification; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
August 10, 2017 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION to Stay LCR 23(i)(3) Deadline for Filing Motion for Class Certification, filed by Defendant Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.. Noting Date 8/10/2017, (Smith, Douglas)
August 9, 2017 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent PET Acquisition LLC, Other Affiliate Petco Holdings, Inc. LLC, Other Affiliate Petco Animal Supplies, Inc. for Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc. (Smith, Douglas)
August 2, 2017 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc. must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/9/2017. (GMR)
July 24, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tana Lin on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah LePine. (Lin, Tana)
July 24, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney T David Copley on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah LePine. (Copley, T)
July 14, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Douglas Edward Smith on behalf of Defendant Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.. (Smith, Douglas)
July 13, 2017 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc. on 7/7/2017, filed by Plaintiff Deborah LePine. (Hammond, Julian)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/25/2017, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/11/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/18/2017, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
June 22, 2017 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to defendant Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.. (GMR)
June 22, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-4919504) Attorney Julian Hammond added to party Deborah LePine(pty:pla), filed by Deborah LePine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hammond, Julian)
June 22, 2017 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LePine v. Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Edward Smith
Represented By: Emily R. Cardenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah LePine
Represented By: Julian Hammond
Represented By: T David Copley
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?