Casterlow-Bey v. Keisler et al
Plaintiff: Gary Casterlow-Bey
Defendant: J. Keisler and Lakewood Police Department
Case Number: 3:2017cv05561
Filed: July 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OR FILE WAIVERS OF SERVICE AND ANSWER signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. Defendants are Ordered to Show Cause on or before February 7, 2018, why personal service should not be ordered and defendants directed to pay the costs of service. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Gary Casterlow-Bey, Prisoner ID: 911900)(GMR)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 14 Report and Recommendations. (TG; cc mailed to plaintiff)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by 1st Class Mail to Defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. (CMG)(cc mailed to Plaintiff and Lakewood City Attorney's office)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casterlow-Bey v. Keisler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Casterlow-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Keisler
Represented By: Kimberly J Cox
Represented By: Heidi Ann Wachter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakewood Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?