Casterlow-Bey v. Jarmon
Plaintiff: Gary Casterlow-Bey
Defendant: Andrea Jarmon
Case Number: 3:2017cv05647
Filed: August 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 12 Report and Recommendations. (TG; cc mailed to plaintiff)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OR AMEND COMPLAINT on or before September 29, 2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR- cc: pltf w/forms & pro se info sheet)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying 6 Motion for Court Appointed Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR- cc: pltf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casterlow-Bey v. Jarmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Casterlow-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Jarmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?