Davis v. Gilbert
Petitioner: Charles Jeffery Davis
Respondent: Margaret Gilbert
Case Number: 3:2017cv05665
Filed: August 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Grays Harbor
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 25 GRANTING Petitioner's motion for voluntary dismissal; this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Charles Davis, Prisoner ID: 318058)(DN)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 11 Motion to Stay, signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. Parties are directed to file a joint status report every ninety (90) days that sets forth the progress of petitioner's bar complaint. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Charles Davis, Prisoner ID: 318058)(GMR)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 5 Report and Recommendation, petitioner's application to proceed in forma pauperis 1 is denied as moot because Petitioner has paid the full filing fee; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Charles Davis, Prisoner ID: 318058)(DN)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Charles Jeffery Davis, signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. Show Cause Response or payment of the filing fee due by 10/29/2017. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Charles Davis, Prisoner ID: 318058)(CMG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Jeffery Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Margaret Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?