Casterlow-Bey v. Google.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gary Casterlow-Bey
Defendant: Google.com, Inc. and Amazon.com, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv05686
Filed: August 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS renoting 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to 1/12/2018. Amended Complaint due 1/12/18. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Paper copy sent to plaintiff at Tacoma address. (JL)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (Copy of this order, Plaintiff's complaint, and the Notice of Lawsuit & Waiver of Summons mailed to Defendants on 9/22/17.) (CMG)(cc mailed to Plaintiff at Pierce County Jail.)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying Plaintiff's application for court appointed counsel (Dkt. 1-2); and if Plaintiff wishes assistance with service of the complaint, Plaintiff should fill out the summons forms (including the Defendants' addresses) and return them to the Court no later than 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan.(CMG)(cc mailed to Plaintiff with summons forms)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casterlow-Bey v. Google.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Casterlow-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Rylan L. S. Weythman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?