Goninan v. Washington Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Robert Goninan
Defendant: Washington Department of Corrections, Eleanor Vernell, Karie Rainer, Dan White, Wendy Wachsmuth, Erika Lauretz and Burt
Case Number: 3:2017cv05714
Filed: September 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Mason
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER STAYING CASE: The parties have established good cause for a third stay of this matter, and the Court grants their motion. This matter shall be stayed until September 20, 2021, unless the Court lifts the stay upon the parties' motion. On or before that date, the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court of the status of the matter and whether they agree to any additional stays. The parties shall promptly advise the Court if the settlement terms are satisfied before September 20, 2021; signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KMC)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 97 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order to Amend Complaint and Case Caption, signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. The Clerk is directed to docket the amended complaint and to amend the case caption to be consistent with the amended complaint. (GMR)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 79 and re-referring to Magistrate Judge J. Richard Creatura. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER denying 67 Motion for Sanctions and for Protective Order signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (GMR)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER that Defendants will file supplemental briefing on or before July 13, 2018. **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS ON BRIEFING** Plaintiff may file a supplemental reply on or before July 27, 2018. The Clerk is directed to renote plaintiff's 48 motion for partial summary judgment to 7/27/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 39 Stipulated Motion. This action is stayed until 4/13/18. The Clerk is directed to terminate all pending motions (Dkts. 9 , 20 , 36 ) until the stay expires and the Court orders those motions to be renoted. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER directing the parties to file a clarification, indicating which deadlines the parties have stipulated to stay, on or before February 23, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER directing defendants to respond to plaintiff's surreply and the attached exhibits by 2/9/18. Defendants should address what, if any, changes this filing makes to the argument presented in their response (Dkt. 27) and what changes, if any, have occurred in plaintiff's treatment plan. The Clerk is directed to RE-NOTE plaintiff's 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and 20 MOTION for Oral Argument to 2/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Nathan Goninan, Prisoner ID: 869663)(CMG)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that Plaintiff's 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel; 11 MOTION to file without first exhausting administrative remedies, 19 MOTION for Oral Arguments, and 20 Secon d MOTION for oral arguments are re-noted to 12/15/2017. Defendants are directed to respond to the substantive aspects of the above noted motions on or before 12/11/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Nathan Goninan, Prisoner ID: 869663)(CMG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goninan v. Washington Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Robert Goninan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eleanor Vernell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karie Rainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Wachsmuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erika Lauretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?