City of Tacoma v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff City of Tacoma alleged that Defendants, drug manufacturers of opioids, made false and misleading statements to doctors, patients and the public about the risks and benefits of opioid pain medication for the treatment of long-term or chronic pain. Plaintiff alleged that it has suffered significant economic damages as the result of the increased health care and public safety costs required to respond to opioid-related crimes and emergencies.

Plaintiff: City of Tacoma
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., John and Jane Does, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc and Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 3:2017cv05737
Filed: September 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Referring Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2017 Filing 33 TRANSFERRED CASE opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:17-op-45047 on 12/12/2017. (SWT)
December 12, 2017 Filing 32 MDL 2804 TRANSFER ORDER in re National Prescription Opiate Litigation; District of Northern Ohio; assigned to Judge Dan A. Polster. (SWT)
December 12, 2017 Case sent to District of Northern Ohio by electronic case. (SWT)
December 7, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Carolyn Robbs Bilanko on behalf of Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Bilanko, Carolyn)
December 7, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Curt Roy Hineline on behalf of Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Hineline, Curt)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY AND FOR RELIEF FROM DEADLINES. It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for Defendants to answer or respond to the Complaint shall be 30 days after a final decision by the JPML on the pending MDL Motion. If this action is subject to transfer following thedecision of the JPML, the deadlines for Defendants' answers or responses to the Complaint shall then be determined by the transferee court. It is further ORDERED that any and all dates or deadlines arising before the deadline forDefendants' answers or responses to the Complaint, if any are to be filed in this action, are suspended until after Defendants answers or responses to the complaint are filed. Defendants' Motion to Stay and for Relief From Deadlines (Dkt. #27 ) is moot. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
November 15, 2017 Filing 28 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER by parties re #27 MOTION to Stay and for Relief From Deadlines (Adams, Thomas)
November 9, 2017 Filing 27 MOTION to Stay and for Relief From Deadlines, filed by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/17/2017, (Adams, Thomas)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re #22 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney R. Ryan Stoll for Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma, L.P., and The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #21 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Patrick J Fitzgerald for Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma, L.P., and The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 25, 2017 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc. for The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Adams, Thomas)
October 25, 2017 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Calfo, Angelo)
October 20, 2017 Filing 22 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY R. Ryan Stoll FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5060556 (Adams, Thomas)
October 20, 2017 Filing 21 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5060537 (Adams, Thomas)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Deadline to Answer or Respond to Complaint. Pursuant to the foregoing stipulation, the deadline for all Defendants to answer or respond to the Complaint is extended to December 11, 2017. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
October 19, 2017 Filing 19 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Noting Date 10/19/2017, (Calfo, Angelo)
October 19, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Angelo J Calfo on behalf of Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Calfo, Angelo)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Stipulated Motion Extending Deadline for the Purdue Defendants to answer or respond to the Complaint. Deadline extended to 12/11/2017. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
October 13, 2017 Attorneys Ronald J Friedman and Andrew W. Durland for Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., and The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. added per #15 Notice of Appearance. (KB)
October 13, 2017 Filing 16 Stipulated MOTION Extending Deadline for Purdue Defendants to Answer or Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendants Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. Noting Date 10/13/2017, (Adams, Thomas)
October 13, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas Dean Adams on behalf of Defendants Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Adams, Thomas)
October 11, 2017 Filing 14 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc on 10/2/2017 (Ko, David)
October 11, 2017 Filing 13 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Endo Health Solutions Inc. on 10/2/2017 (Ko, David)
October 11, 2017 Filing 12 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 9/28/2017 (Ko, David)
October 10, 2017 Filing 11 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. on 10/2/2017 (Ko, David)
October 10, 2017 Filing 10 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Purdue Pharma, Inc. on 10/2/2017 (Ko, David)
October 10, 2017 Filing 9 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Purdue Pharma, L.P. on 10/2/2017 (Ko, David)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Ricardo S Martinez for all further proceedings. All future documents filed in this case must bear cause numbers ending in RSM and must bear the new Judges name in the upper right hand corner of the document. Signed by Chief Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
October 2, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE re: Amended Schedule of Actions, Amended Proof of Service and Supplemental Proof of Service - filed with the MDL Panel (MDL 17-P-54, In re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation) (PM)
September 29, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Transfer of Actions - filed with the MDL Panel (MDL 17-P-54, In re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation). (PM)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 12/13/2017, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/29/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/6/2017, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
September 14, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 11/13/2017. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
September 14, 2017 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re #3 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (KAM)
September 14, 2017 Joint Status Report NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 12/13/2017. (KAM)
September 13, 2017 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., and John and Jane Does. (GMR)
September 13, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5015686) Attorney Derek W Loeser added to party City of Tacoma(pty:pla), filed by City of Tacoma. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Loeser, Derek)
September 13, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5015686) Attorney Derek W Loeser added to party City of Tacoma(pty:pla), filed by City of Tacoma. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Loeser, Derek)
September 13, 2017 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Tacoma v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Tacoma
Represented By: Derek W Loeser
Represented By: David J Ko
Represented By: Daniel P Mensher
Represented By: William Cody Fosbre
Represented By: Christopher D Bacha
Represented By: Amy C Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Angelo J Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Curt Roy Hineline
Represented By: Carolyn Robbs Bilanko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Represented By: Ronald J Friedman
Represented By: Patrick J Fitzgerald
Represented By: Thomas Dean Adams
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Andrew W. Durland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Curt Roy Hineline
Represented By: Carolyn Robbs Bilanko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Represented By: Ronald J Friedman
Represented By: Patrick J Fitzgerald
Represented By: Thomas Dean Adams
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Andrew W. Durland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc
Represented By: Ronald J Friedman
Represented By: Patrick J Fitzgerald
Represented By: Thomas Dean Adams
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Andrew W. Durland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Angelo J Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?