State of Washington v. The GEO Group Inc

Plaintiff: State of Washington
Defendant: The GEO Group Inc
Case Number: 3:2017cv05806
Filed: October 9, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Thurston
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2018 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STATE'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR STRIKE DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIMS AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
December 13, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF STATE OF WASHINGTON'S MOTION TO REMAND, denying 15 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
December 11, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
December 6, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON GEO'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, denying 10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Washington v. The GEO Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: La Rond Baker
Represented By: Marsha J. Chien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The GEO Group Inc
Represented By: Charles A Deacon(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mark Emery(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Joan K Mell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?