December 19, 2023 |
Filing
236
ORDER (1) FINALLY APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; (2) APPROVING DISBURSEMENTS PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; (3) APPROVING PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY FEES, LITIGATION COSTS, NOTICE COSTS AND CASE CONTRIBUTION AWARDS; AND (4) ORDERING FINAL REPORT ON DISB URSEMENT OF QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND. It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The Settlement Agreement is approved as fair, reasonable, and adequate under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23, and its terms shall bind class members, except any members who timely opted ou t. Plaintiffs' motion for final approval, Dkt. 231 , is GRANTED. 2. Class counsel is awarded attorney fees, litigation costs, and reimbursement of costs of notice and administration, as set forth above. These amounts are authorized and dir ected to be paid to class counsel from the Qualified Settlement Fund. Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees, Dkt. 221 , is GRANTED. 3. Class counsel and/or Kroll is also authorized to distribute checks to class members and the Plaintif fs in accordance with the Settlement Agreement and this Order. These amounts are authorized to be paid from the Qualified Settlement Fund. 4. Case contribution awards of $11,000 to each Plaintiff, totaling $22,000, is approved, and class counsel and/or Kroll is authorized to distribute that sum from the Qualified Settlement Fund. 5. Class counsel and/or Kroll is authorized to pay the continuing costs of claims administration and class notice from the Qualified Settlement Fund. Cl ass counsel and/or Kroll shall document each such payment in a final report and submit it for the Courts final approval. 6. Class counsel is ordered to submit a final report in accordance with the Settlement Agreement and this Order. 7. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over this matter until the Qualified Settlement Fund is closed and an Order of Dismissal is entered. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(AMD)
|
September 22, 2023 |
Filing
220
ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 218 Motion to Appoint Notice and Claims Administrator. The Court appoints Kroll as the Notice and Claims Administrator to provide the notice and claims administration services required by the Settlement Agreement and Preliminary Approval Order. (see order for further specifics) Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(MW)
|
September 8, 2023 |
Filing
213
ORDER re Plaintiffs' 210 Motion (1) For Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement with Rapid Financial and Cache Valley Bank; (2) For Approval of Written Class Notice; (3) To Establish A Process to Appoint Notice and Claims Administrator and Consider Published Notice Package; and (4) To Establish A Final Settlement Approval Hearing and Process. Based on the record before it, the Court tentatively finds, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(e), that the Agreement attac hed as Appendix 1 (Dkt. No. 210 -1) and Appendix 2 (Dkt. No. 210 -2) to the Motion is fair, reasonable, and adequate. A Fairness Hearing to consider whether the proposed Agreement is fair, reasonable, and adequate and should be finally approved is scheduled for 12/18/2023, at 2:30 p.m. at the United States Courthouse, 1717 Pacific Ave., Tacoma, WA 98402. Any class member who wishes to comment on or object to the Agreement must submit written comments and/or objections to the Court no later than 12/4/2023. Any class member who wishes to opt-out of the Agreement shall do so no later than 12/4/2023. A Motion for Final Approval of the Agreement, together with any supporting declarations or other documentation, must be filed no later than 12/11/2023. (see order for further specifics) Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(MW)
|
June 26, 2023 |
Filing
209
ORDER denying Christopher Watkin's 195 Motion to Intervene. However, the notice to the class describing the settlement shall inform the class members of the Nevada case and of their right to opt out of this class and proposed settlement if they deem it beneficial to pursue their claims in the Nevada case. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(MW)
|
January 24, 2023 |
Filing
188
ORDER granting Parties' 187 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Party. All claims brought by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Reichert and Gary Moyer, on behalf of themselves and the Washington Subclass, against Defendant Keefe Commissary Network, L.L.C., d/b/a Access Corrections are DISMISSED with prejudice and without any additional award of costs or attorney fees to any party. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(MW)
|
June 2, 2021 |
Filing
147
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' 134 136 MOTIONS TO COMPEL ARBITRATION signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (AMD)
|
October 30, 2019 |
Filing
116
ORDER denying 104 Defendants Motion to Compel; denying 106 Defendants' Motion to Compel; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
|
May 8, 2019 |
Filing
87
ORDER granting in part and reaerving in part 69 Motion to Certify Class; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
|
May 1, 2018 |
Filing
53
ORDER denying 36 Defendants Rapid Investments and Cache Valley Bank's Motion to Compel Arbitration; denying 40 Defendant Keefe Commissary Network's Motion to Compel Arbitration; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
|