Green v. Gilbert et al
Plaintiff: DeAngelo A Green
Defendant: Margaret Gilbert, Michael Gleason, John Doe and Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2017cv05898
Filed: October 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Grays Harbor
Presiding Judge: David W. Christel
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 118 GRANTING Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 95 ; this matter is closed; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(DeAngelo Green, Prisoner ID: 310589)(DN)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 AMENDED ORDER re 76 Order granting the Motion to Strike: The Clerk is directed to strike plaintiff's third amended complaint 54 from the docket. The Clerk is directed to file the Third Amended Complaint (Dkt. 43-1, pp. 1-19) as an approved third amended complaint. The Court modifies it's Order direction service 63 and the Order to file answer 64 as follows: defendants shall have until 8/3/19 to file an answer to plaintiff's approved third amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(DeAngelo Green, Prisoner ID: 310589)(CMG)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying 53 Motion for Reconsideration and the 55 MOTION for the Court's Assistance, signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel.**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(DeAngelo Green, Prisoner ID: 310589)(CMG)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER that Defendants Gilbert and Gleason shall file their answer to Plaintiff's 54 Third Amended Complaint on or before 6/15/2018. In the alternative, Defendants Gilbert and Gleason may show cause why they have not filed an answer on or before 6/15/18, and may request an extension of time for file their answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(DeAngelo Green, Prisoner ID: 310589)(CMG)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying 44 Plaintiff's Motion re Objection to Magistrate Judge's Denial of Appointment of Counsel; the Magistrate Judge's Order is AFFIRMED; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(DeAngelo Green, Prisoner ID: 310589)(DN)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER that Plaintiff's Amended Motion to file Amended Complaint 43 is granted in part. Plaintiff may file a Third Amended Complaint on or before May 18, 2018. Plaintiff's motion to amend complaint 41 and Motion to Attach Exhibits 39 are denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel.**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(DeAngelo Green, Prisoner ID: 310589)(CMG)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting Leave to Amend, signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. Plaintiff's First 14 Motion to Amend is Denied as Moot; Plaintiff's Second 15 Motion to Amend is Granted; and Plaintiff's 15 Motion for Awareness is Denied as Moot. The Clerk is directed to separately docket Plaintiff's proposed amended complaint (Dkt. 15 , pp. 6-33) as Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(DeAngelo Green, Prisoner ID: 310589)(GMR)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 8 Motion for Protective Order signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(DeAngelo Green, Prisoner ID: 310589)(GMR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Gilbert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeAngelo A Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?