Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v John Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 3:2017cv05956
Filed: November 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER re plaintiff's 13 Response to the Minute Order entered May 29, 2018, the Court is satisfied that plaintiff and its attorneys have not violated the Court's directive not to communicate directly with any defendant for any purpose until further order of the Court. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER directing plaintiff's counsel to file an affidavit, on or before 6/8/2018, indicating the reasons for such dismissals and, to the extent that settlement was the basis, SHOWING CAUSE why plaintiff and/or its attorneys should not be s anctioned for failing to comply with the Court's directive not to communicate directly with any defendant for any purpose until further order of the Court. To the extent that settlement amounts are set forth in the affidavit, the affidavit may be filed under seal by referencing this Minute Order and without a separate motion to seal. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 6 Motion for Expedited Discovery; striking deadlines for Rule 26(f) conference, exchange of initial disclosures, and Joint Status Report; directing counsel to provide a copy of this Orde r (i) along with the Rule 45 subpoena issued pursuant hereto, (ii) along with any blank summons submitted to the Clerk, and (iii) along with any summons provided under seal to the selected process server. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings LLC
Represented By: Bryan J. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?