March 9, 2023 |
Filing
509
ORDER. Defendants JCI, Crosby, and Powells Motions for Summary Judgment, Dkts. 72 and 263 , 153 , and 231 , respectively, are GRANTED and Deem's remaining maritime wrongful death claims against those defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice . Defendants' Motions to Dismiss on the limitations period, Dkts. 371 , 372 , and 374 , are DENIED. The remainder of JCI's Motion to Dismiss, Dkt. 372 , is DENIED as moot. Deem's Motions for Summary Judgment on Defendants' affirmative defenses, Dkts. 245 and 249 , are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(MW)
|
January 26, 2023 |
Filing
505
ORDER granting Parties' 504 Stipulated MOTION To Extend Deadline on Expert Disclosure. The expert disclosure deadline for JCI's expert Captain McCloskey is 1/25/2023. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(MW)
|
December 5, 2022 |
Filing
493
ORDER granting Parties' 491 Joint Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadlines. Defendants Expert Disclosures due by 1/4/2023. Discovery to be completed by 1/4/2023. Depositions of Plaintiff's family members may be taken after the discovery cut-off of 1/4/2023, but prior to the due date of the pre-trial order. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(MW)
|
November 16, 2022 |
Filing
489
ORDER. Deem's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing re Maritime Law, Dkt. 377 , is GRANTED. She shall file one brief no longer than fifteen (15) pages within fourteen (14) days. Each defendant may file a ten-page Response within sev en days of Deem's brief. Deem may file a single reply or individual replies not to exceed more than fifteen (15) total pages within seven (7) days of the Response. The remaining motions, Dkts. 72 , 153 , 231 , 245 , 249 , 263 , 371 , and 372 , are RE-NOTED for 12/16/2022. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(MW)
|
January 29, 2020 |
Filing
458
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY re 457 Stipulation, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (GMR)
|
January 9, 2020 |
Filing
430
ORDER DECONSOLIDATING CASES, REOPENING CASE, REQUESTING RESPONSES, AND RESETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. The Clerk shall reopen 3:18-cv-05527-BHS; and deconsolidate 3:17-cv-05965-BHS and 3:18-cv-05527-BHS; Deem may fi le supplemental responses to the pending summary judgment motions by the Deem 1 defendants, (Dkts. 63 , 65 , 232 , 261 ), no later than January 17, 2020; Defendants may file supplemental replies no later than January 22, 2020; and the pretrial conference is continued to February 3, 2020 at 11:00a m. (**Remaining Deem 2 defendants FMC Corporation and McNally Industries LLC are terminated.)(GMR)
|
January 2, 2020 |
Filing
416
ORDER granting 263 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 340 Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying as moot 372 Motion to Dismiss, 377 Motion for Leave, 72 Motion for Summary Judgment, 245 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Defendant John Crane Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
|
December 6, 2019 |
Filing
415
ORDER denying as moot 153 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 371 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Crosby Valve LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
|
November 22, 2019 |
Filing
408
ORDER denying 377 Motion for Leave; denying 239 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 254 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 274 Motion for Extension of Time; Cleaver-Brooks Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
|
August 6, 2019 |
Filing
331
ORDER granting 125 Motion to Dismiss; granting 165 Motion to apply maritime law; denying 182 Motion to Certify. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint by 8/16/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
|
June 10, 2019 |
Filing
185
ORDER granting 106 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
|
April 25, 2019 |
Filing
105
ORDER granting 69 Defendants FMC Corporation, McNally Industries LLC., Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
|
April 18, 2019 |
Filing
102
ORDER RESERVING RULING & Requesting Supplemental Briefing on 61 Motion for Summary Judgment, 63 Motion for Summary Judgment and 65 Motion for Summary Judgment. Motions are RE-NOTED for 5/24/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
|
December 13, 2018 |
Filing
52
ORDER Granting in Part 42 MOTION for Consolidation, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. The Motion is granted in part to the extent that this matter is consolidated with Cause No. 3:18-cv-05527-BHS for purposes of discovery and for purposes o f handling pretrial matters through the Court's disposition of summary judgment or such other time prior to trial as the Court deems appropriate; and denied in part because the Court will not consolidate these actions for trial at this time and will reserve any determination of that issue until discovery is completed. This ruling is without prejudice, and plaintiff may again move to consolidate these actions for trial after discovery has closed. The parties shall agree to an amended caption that adequately reflects the consolidated actions. The Clerk shall administratively close Cause No. 3:18-cv-05527-BHS, strike the scheduling order in this action, and issue a new abbreviated scheduling order consistent with the scheduling order in Cause No. 3:18-cv-05527-BHS. (GMR)
|