Yaw et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Donald Arthur Yaw and Marietta Dianne Yaw
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Armstrong International Inc., BNS Co., CBS Corporation, Crane Co., Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc., Flowserve US Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Gardner-Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Grinnell LLC, Honeywell International, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Western Auto Supply and The William Powell Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv05405
Filed: May 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Kitsap
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER Granting 284 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice, defendant Grinnell LLC, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (GMR)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER granting 281 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice defendant Goulds Pumps Inc, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (GMR)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER denying 266 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER granting 113 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 205 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 211 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 192 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 204 Motion for Partial Summ ary Judgment; denying as moot 208 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Warren Pumps LLC, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (individually and as) and Ingersoll-Rand Company terminated. Status Report due by 8/23/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER granting 95 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by General Electric Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, CBS Corporation. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER RESERVING RULING and Requesting Supplemental Briefing on 95 Motion for Summary Judgment, and GRANTING 140 Motion to Amend. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint. 95 MOTION for Summary Judgment is RE-NOTED for 5/24/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yaw et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Arthur Yaw
Represented By: Benjamin H. Adams(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Charles W Branham, III(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas J. Breen
Represented By: Lucas W.H. Garrett
Represented By: Elizabeth Jean McLafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marietta Dianne Yaw
Represented By: Benjamin H. Adams(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Charles W Branham, III(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas J. Breen
Represented By: Lucas W.H. Garrett
Represented By: Elizabeth Jean McLafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie B Ballard
Represented By: David E Chawes
Represented By: Bennett J Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNS Co.
Represented By: Delian P Deltchev
Represented By: Michael Anthony Jaeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc.
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Barry Neal Mesher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner-Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Claude Bosworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Mary P Gaston
Represented By: Kristine E Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: James Edward Horne
Represented By: Michael Edward Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard G Gawlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Represented By: Dana C Kopij
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Auto Supply
Represented By: James D Hicks
Represented By: Melissa K Roeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William Powell Company
Represented By: James D Hicks
Represented By: Brian Bernard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?