In re: Fraser's Boiler Service Inc

Appellee: The Travelers Indemnity Co, Chicago Insurance Co, Providence Washington Insurance Company, U.S. Trustee, Zurich American Insurance Company (as successor-in-interest to Maine Bonding and Casualty Company), Century Indemnity Company, Allianz Underwriters Ins Co, Resource Transition Consultants LLC, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London and Certain London Market Companies, DJO Services LLC, Official Unsecured Creditors Committee, Fraser's Boiler Service, Inc., Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company and The Travelers Indemnity Company
Interested Party: Bankruptcy Appeals (TAC), Chicago Insurance Company, Allianz Underwriters Insurance Company and Zurich American Insurance Company
Appellant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA and London Market Insurers
Case Number: 3:2018cv05638
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
0 Judge: Ronald B Leighton
1 Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2018 At the request of Chambers, this case Reassigned to Judge Ronald B. Leighton, as related to C18-5637RBL. (Judge Benjamin H. Settle no longer assigned to the case.) (CMG)
September 26, 2018 20 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Consolidation of Appeals by parties (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Feinberg, Michael)
September 13, 2018 The bankruptcy appeal is ripe for consideration on 12/7/2018. (GMR)
September 13, 2018 19 CERTIFICATE of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Appellant Brief due by 10/23/2018, Appellee Response Brief due by 11/23/2018, Appellant Reply Brief due by 12/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Record)(Bankruptcy Appeals (Tac)(SLM)
September 4, 2018 18 LETTER from the United States Trustee re Non-Participation in Appeal filed by U.S. Trustee (Flynn, Sarah)
September 4, 2018 17 AMENDMENT [London Market Insurers' Amended FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement] to #16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Appellant London Market Insurers (Oliner, Aron)
August 23, 2018 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by London Market Insurers (Oliner, Aron)
August 22, 2018 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Resource Transition Consultants LLC (Pharris, Danial)
August 21, 2018 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Allianz SE for Chicago Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Chicago Insurance Company (Turner, Sarah)
August 21, 2018 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Allianz SE for Allianz Underwriters Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Allianz Underwriters Insurance Company (Turner, Sarah)
August 21, 2018 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp. for The Travelers Indemnity Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company (Brownstein, Nancy)
August 21, 2018 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by DJO Services LLC (Krattli, Darren)
August 21, 2018 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Fraser's Boiler Service, Inc. (Krattli, Darren)
August 21, 2018 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company (Syhre, Daniel)
August 21, 2018 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Zurich American Insurance Company (Soha, Steven)
August 21, 2018 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (Brady, Barbara)
August 20, 2018 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Enstar Group Ltd., Other Affiliate PW Acquisition Company, Other Affiliate PWAC Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Enstar Investments Inc., Other Affiliate Enstar Holdings (US) Inc., Other Affiliate Harper Holdings SARL, Other Affiliate Kenmare Holdings Ltd. for Providence Washington Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Providence Washington Insurance Company (Ekberg, Charles)
August 17, 2018 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent INA Corporation, Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent INA Financial Corp., Corporate Parent Brandywine Holdings Corp. for Century Indemnity Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Century Indemnity Company (Linde, Thomas)
August 16, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, that the following parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/23/2018: London Market Insurers; National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA; Fraser's Boiler Service Inc; Resource Transition Consultants LLC; DJO Services LLC; Allianz Underwriters Insurance Company; Chicago Insurance Company; Century Indemnity Company; Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company; Zurich American Insurance Company; Providence Washington Insurance Company; The Travelers Indemnity Company; and the Official Unsecured Creditors Committee if applicable. (GMR- cc: DJO)
August 16, 2018 4 Record Status Request Regarding Bankruptcy Appeal due by 9/17/2018. (GMR- cc: DJO)
August 16, 2018 3 LETTER re Filing of Bankruptcy Appeal. (GMR- cc: DJO)
August 16, 2018 2 NOTICE TO PARTIES RE: PRO HAC VICE ATTORNEYS - **ACTION REQUIRED** Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice (PHV) in the Bankruptcy Court should not reapply for PHV admission with the District Court. However, all PHV attorneys appearing, participating, or wanting to receive notices in bankruptcy appeals before the District Court must register with the District Court's Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, by submitting the WAWD Attorney ECF Registration Form as instructed (attached). Failure to properly register may result in the corresponding PHV attorney's notice being terminated. (GMR)
August 9, 2018 1 TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS for USBC No 18-41245, BK Internal Appeal No. 18-T007 re: Orders No. 284 and 301. (Bankruptcy Appeals (Tac) Modified on 8/16/2018 to add applicable orders only (GMR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Fraser's Boiler Service Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Travelers Indemnity Co
Represented By: Frank Winston, Jr
Represented By: Nancy A Brownstein
Represented By: Lauren Ashley Dorsett
Represented By: Joshua R Taylor
Represented By: Filiberto Agusti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Chicago Insurance Co
Represented By: Jacob Cohn
Represented By: Sarah N Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Providence Washington Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles R Ekberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Sarah Rose Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Zurich American Insurance Company (as successor-in-interest to Maine Bonding and Casualty Company)
Represented By: Steven Soha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Century Indemnity Company
Represented By: Thomas Scott Linde
Represented By: Mark D Plevin
Represented By: Michael M. Sperry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Allianz Underwriters Ins Co
Represented By: Jacob Cohn
Represented By: Sarah N Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Resource Transition Consultants LLC
Represented By: Kevin P Hanchett
Represented By: Craig J Litherland
Represented By: Danial D Pharris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London and Certain London Market Companies
Represented By: Philip R Matthews
Represented By: Jessica Bohl
Represented By: Russell W Roten
Represented By: ARON M OLINER
Represented By: Dominica C Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DJO Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Official Unsecured Creditors Committee
Represented By: Mark D. Waldron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fraser's Boiler Service, Inc.
Represented By: Katrina F Self
Represented By: Darren R. Krattli
Represented By: Danial D Pharris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company
Represented By: James P. Ruggeri
Represented By: Daniel L Syhre
Represented By: Joshua D Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Frank Winston, Jr
Represented By: Lauren Ashley Dorsett
Represented By: Filiberto Agusti
Represented By: Nancy Anne Brownstein
Represented By: Joshua Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bankruptcy Appeals (TAC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Chicago Insurance Company
Represented By: Jacob Cohn
Represented By: Sarah N Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Allianz Underwriters Insurance Company
Represented By: Jacob Cohn
Represented By: Sarah N Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven Soha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Diana Kay Carey
Represented By: Michael M. Feinberg
Represented By: Barbara J Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: London Market Insurers
Represented By: Diana Kay Carey
Represented By: Michael M. Feinberg
Represented By: Jessica Bohl
Represented By: ARON M OLINER
Represented By: Barbara J Brady
Represented By: Russell W. Roten
Represented By: Aron M. Oliner
Represented By: Dominica C. Anderson
Represented By: Philip R Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?