Miller v. Key

Petitioner: Weston Garrett Miller
Respondent: James Key
Case Number: 3:2018cv05700
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
0 Judge: J Richard Creatura
1 Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paul Douglas Weisser on behalf of Respondent James Key. **PRINT ALL**(Weston Miller, Prisoner ID: 366767)(Weisser, Paul)
September 20, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER FOR SERVICE AND ANSWER, 2254 PETITION by E-Mail upon the Respondent and upon the Attorney General of the State of Washington; signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. ( #7 Petition and this Order emailed 9/21/18) **4 3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Weston Miller, Prisoner ID: 366767)(SP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2018: #1 Pro se Instruction Sheet) (SP). Modified on 9/21/2018 to add document and correct page count (SP).
September 20, 2018 7 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Weston Garrett Miller. (IFP Granted) **32 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Weston Miller, Prisoner ID: 366767)(SP)
September 20, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Weston Miller, Prisoner ID: 366767)(SP)
September 17, 2018 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Prison Trust Statement, filed by Weston Garrett Miller. (Attachments: #1 Prison Trust Statement, #2 Proposed 2254 Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Envelope)**38 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Weston Miller, Prisoner ID: 366767)(SP)
September 17, 2018 4 IFP deficiency corrected re #3 IFP Deficiency Letter. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Weston Miller, Prisoner ID: 366767)(SP)
August 29, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER: RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE. The Western District of Washington received documents (Dkt. #1 Proposed 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus) from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Airway Heights Corrections Center. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Weston Miller, Prisoner ID: 366767)(SP)
August 29, 2018 3 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency: - Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 9/28/2018 to correct **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Weston Miller, Prisoner ID: 366767)(SP)
August 29, 2018 2 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months.- Signature of financial officer is missing from the document(s). Please sign as appropriate. Filer has until 9/28/2018 to correct. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Weston Miller, Prisoner ID: 366767)(SP) Modified on 8/29/2018 to reflect no form created (SP).
August 27, 2018 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, filed by Petitioner Weston Garrett Miller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)**36 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Weston Miller, Prisoner ID: 366767)(SP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Key
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Weston Garrett Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Key
Represented By: Paul Douglas Weisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?