Nolte v. Coffey et al

Plaintiff: Heather Nolte
Defendant: Charles Coffey, Jane Doe Coffey and Grocery Outlet Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv05708
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2018 12 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES ; Length of Trial: *FOUR DAYS*. Jury Trial is set for 10/21/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom B before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Joinder of Parties due by 11/19/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/24/2019, Motions due by 6/3/2019, Discovery completed by 6/24/2019, Dispositive motions due by 7/23/2019, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 8/14/2019, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 9/17/2019, 39.1 Settlement Report due by 10/1/2019, Motions in Limine due by 9/16/2019, Pretrial Order due by 10/4/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Trial briefs to be submitted by 10/7/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 10/7/2019. Authorized by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK)
October 15, 2018 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas A Heinrich on behalf of Defendants Charles Coffey, Grocery Outlet Inc. (Heinrich, Thomas)
October 15, 2018 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 3-4. (Heinrich, Thomas)
September 28, 2018 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Grocery Outlet Inc (Reppart, Kimberly)
August 30, 2018 8 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (ST)
August 30, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/6/2018. (ST)
August 30, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER: Incorrect divisional office (Seattle) selected by filer upon case opening. Case number 18-cv-1280 has been terminated. Please see C18-cv-5708-RBL for all filings in this matter. (ST)
August 30, 2018 7 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Cowlitz County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ST)
August 30, 2018 Hon. Ronald B. Leighton added. (ST)
August 29, 2018 6 NOTICE Notice to Plaintiff of Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant Grocery Outlet Inc. (Heinrich, Thomas)
August 29, 2018 5 DECLARATION of Kimberly A. Reppart in Support of re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Grocery Outlet Inc (Heinrich, Thomas)
August 29, 2018 4 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Grocery Outlet Inc (Heinrich, Thomas)
August 29, 2018 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant Grocery Outlet Inc. (Heinrich, Thomas)
August 29, 2018 2 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendant's Notice to Superior Court of Filing of Notice of Removal by Defendant Grocery Outlet Inc (Heinrich, Thomas)
August 29, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cowlitz County Superior Court, case number 17-2-00838-08; (Receipt # 0981-5452541), filed by Grocery Outlet Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice to Plaintiff of Notice of Removal, #3 Counsel's Verification of State Court Proceedings, #4 Declaration of Kimberly A. Reppart ISO Defendant's Notice of Removal of Action)(Heinrich, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2018: #5 Complaint, #6 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal of Defendant S & C Grocery Outlet Inc) (ST).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nolte v. Coffey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Coffey
Represented By: Kimberly Reppart
Represented By: Thomas A Heinrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Coffey
Represented By: Kimberly Reppart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grocery Outlet Inc
Represented By: Kimberly Reppart
Represented By: Thomas A Heinrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Nolte
Represented By: Craig Michael McReary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?