Boyle et al v. City of Puyallup et al
Plaintiff: Jerome Connolly, Christian Rainey, Glenn Humphreys, Terry Linblade, Nicki Wedgeworth and Nancy Boyle
Defendant: Pierce County and City of Puyallup
Case Number: 3:2018cv05750
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Carolyn S Gilbert on behalf of Plaintiffs Nancy Boyle, Jerome Connolly, Glenn Humphreys, Terry Linblade, Christian Rainey, Nicki Wedgeworth. (Gilbert, Carolyn)
October 17, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by City of Puyallup.(Rosenberg, Adam)
October 16, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Pierce County.(Burton, Alicia)
October 12, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE by parties (Burton, Alicia)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Tristia Bauman for Nancy Boyle, Jerome Connolly, Glenn Humphreys, Terry Linblade, Christian Rainey and Nicki Wedgeworth, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(SP)
October 2, 2018 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Tristia Bauman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Nancy Boyle, Jerome Connolly, Glenn Humphreys, Terry Linblade, Christian Rainey, Nicki Wedgeworth (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5492967 (Peterson, Sherilyn)
October 2, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Terry Linblade, Glenn Humphreys, Jerome Connolly, Nicki Wedgeworth, Nancy Boyle, Christian Rainey.(Peterson, Sherilyn)
September 28, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Alicia Marie Burton on behalf of Defendant Pierce County. (Burton, Alicia)
September 26, 2018 ***Consent deadline terminated; case reassigned to a district judge. (KAM)
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle for all further proceedings by Kelly Miller, Deputy Clerk, on behalf of Clerk of Court, William M. McCool. (Cc to BHS) (KAM)
September 25, 2018 Attorney Kathleen X Goodman for City of Puyallup added; per #8 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Adam Rosenberg on behalf of Defendant City of Puyallup. (Rosenberg, Adam)
September 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re #3 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (KAM)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shawn E Arthur on behalf of Defendant City of Puyallup. (Arthur, Shawn)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joseph N. Beck on behalf of Defendant City of Puyallup. (Beck, Joseph)
September 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re #3 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (KAM)
September 18, 2018 JSR NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 12/17/2018. (KAM)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 12/17/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/3/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/10/2018, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 11/19/2018. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) City of Puyallup and Pierce County. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SP)
September 17, 2018 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (SP)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5472129) Attorney Sherilyn Christine Peterson added to party Nancy Boyle(pty:pla), Attorney Sherilyn Christine Peterson added to party Jerome Connolly(pty:pla), Attorney Sherilyn Christine Peterson added to party Glenn Humphreys(pty:pla), Attorney Sherilyn Christine Peterson added to party Terry Linblade(pty:pla), Attorney Sherilyn Christine Peterson added to party Christian Rainey(pty:pla), Attorney Sherilyn Christine Peterson added to party Nicki Wedgeworth(pty:pla), filed by Terry Linblade, Glenn Humphreys, Jerome Connolly, Nicki Wedgeworth, Nancy Boyle, Christian Rainey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons City of Puyallup, #3 Summons Pierce County)(Peterson, Sherilyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyle et al v. City of Puyallup et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Connolly
Represented By: David S Steele
Represented By: Sherilyn Christine Peterson
Represented By: Tristia Bauman
Represented By: Carolyn S Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Rainey
Represented By: David S Steele
Represented By: Sherilyn Christine Peterson
Represented By: Tristia Bauman
Represented By: Carolyn S Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Humphreys
Represented By: David S Steele
Represented By: Sherilyn Christine Peterson
Represented By: Tristia Bauman
Represented By: Carolyn S Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Linblade
Represented By: David S Steele
Represented By: Sherilyn Christine Peterson
Represented By: Tristia Bauman
Represented By: Carolyn S Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicki Wedgeworth
Represented By: David S Steele
Represented By: Sherilyn Christine Peterson
Represented By: Tristia Bauman
Represented By: Carolyn S Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Boyle
Represented By: David S Steele
Represented By: Sherilyn Christine Peterson
Represented By: Tristia Bauman
Represented By: Carolyn S Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce County
Represented By: Alicia Marie Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Puyallup
Represented By: Kathleen X Goodman
Represented By: Adam Rosenberg
Represented By: Shawn E Arthur
Represented By: Joseph N. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?