Steakhouse Seattle, LLC et al v. United States
Plaintiff: James Nations and Steakhouse Seattle, LLC
Defendant: Annette L. Hayes, Sonny Perdue, Jefferson B Sessions, United States of America, Jesus Mendoza and United States
Case Number: 3:2018cv05751
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs James Nations, Steakhouse Seattle, LLC re #4 Summons Issued (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Certificate of Service)(Nicholson, Virginia)
September 20, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by James Nations, Steakhouse Seattle, LLC (Nicholson, Virginia)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Stewart D Fried for James Nations and Steakhouse Seattle, LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(SP)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/17/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/3/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/10/2018, by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Stewart Fried FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs James Nations, Steakhouse Seattle, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5475264 (Nicholson, Virginia)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 PRAECIPE to attach document Corrected Signature Page re #1 Complaint by Plaintiffs James Nations, Steakhouse Seattle, LLC (Nicholson, Virginia)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) United States. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(SP)
September 17, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) Steakhouse Seattle, LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/24/2018. (SP)
September 17, 2018 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #1 Complaint was improperly signed by Derrick De Vera. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (SP)
September 17, 2018 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (SP)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiffs James Nations, Steakhouse Seattle, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Nicholson, Virginia)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiffs James Nations, Steakhouse Seattle, LLC. (Nicholson, Virginia)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5472246) Attorney Virginia Rosalie Nicholson added to party James Nations(pty:pla), filed by Steakhouse Seattle, LLC, James Nations.(Nicholson, Virginia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steakhouse Seattle, LLC et al v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette L. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny Perdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson B Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Nations
Represented By: Virginia Rosalie Nicholson
Represented By: Derrick Anthony De Vera
Represented By: Stewart D Fried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steakhouse Seattle, LLC
Represented By: Derrick Anthony De Vera
Represented By: Virginia Rosalie Nicholson
Represented By: Stewart D Fried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?