Owen v. Hackett Law Firm LLC et al

Plaintiff: Ronald A Owen
Defendant: Hackett Law Firm LLC, Ryan Hackett, Paula Stegemeier and Rosemary Zook
Case Number: 3:2018cv05760
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
0 Judge: David W Christel
1 Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2018 13 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to case, by Clerk, William M. McCool. (KEB)
October 10, 2018 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Hackett Law Firm LLC (Mitchell, Johnston)
October 10, 2018 11 DECLARATION of Johnston Mitchell filed by Defendants Ryan Hackett, Hackett Law Firm LLC, Paula Stegemeier, Rosemary Zook re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Mitchell, Johnston)
October 10, 2018 10 DECLARATION of Paula Stegemeier filed by Defendants Ryan Hackett, Hackett Law Firm LLC, Paula Stegemeier, Rosemary Zook re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Mitchell, Johnston)
October 10, 2018 9 DECLARATION of Rosemary Zook filed by Defendants Ryan Hackett, Hackett Law Firm LLC, Paula Stegemeier, Rosemary Zook re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Mitchell, Johnston)
October 10, 2018 8 DECLARATION of Ryan Hackett filed by Defendants Ryan Hackett, Hackett Law Firm LLC, Paula Stegemeier, Rosemary Zook re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Mitchell, Johnston)
October 10, 2018 7 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Venue filed by Defendants Ryan Hackett, Hackett Law Firm LLC, Paula Stegemeier, Rosemary Zook. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/9/2018, (Mitchell, Johnston) Modified on 10/31/2018 to add transfer venue to title. (MGC).
October 3, 2018 6 NOTICE: Plaintiff Ronald A Owen has registered to receive electronic service. The party WILL NOT be e-filing. (PS)
September 21, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge David W. Christel. (cc: Plaintiff via U.S. mail) (KEB)
September 21, 2018 Joint Status Report NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 12/20/2018. (KEB)
September 21, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 12/20/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/6/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/13/2018, by Judge David W. Christel. (cc: Plaintiff via U.S. mail) (KEB)
September 21, 2018 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re #3 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (KEB)
September 21, 2018 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 11/20/2018. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (cc: Plaintiff via U.S. Mail) (KEB)
September 19, 2018 2 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Oregon, case numbers 18-30916-DWH7 and 18-03057-DWH; filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Owen. (GMR)
September 19, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against defendants Hackett Law Firm LLC, Ryan Hackett, Rosemary Zook and Paula Stegemeier, filed by Ronald A Owen. (Summons(es) not received to issue) (Receipt # TAC015333) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Defendant Addresses)(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owen v. Hackett Law Firm LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald A Owen
Represented By: Ronald A Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hackett Law Firm LLC
Represented By: Johnston A Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Hackett
Represented By: Johnston A Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Stegemeier
Represented By: Johnston A Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemary Zook
Represented By: Johnston A Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?