Edenstrom v. GMAC Mortgage LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dean Edenstrom
Defendant: MERS Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Worldwide Abstract Services Agency, Ideal Mortgage Bankers, Ltd dba Lend America, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc and Ideal Mortgage Bankers Ltd
Case Number: 3:2018cv05794
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Judicial Notice, filed by Defendants GMAC Mortgage LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/14/2018, (McCormick, Joseph)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Aaron Joseph Atkission for Plaintiff Dean Edenstrom. (Atkission, Aaron)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 STATEMENT by Defendant GMAC Mortgage LLC (McCormick, Joseph)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/2/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/18/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/26/2018, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Thurston County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GMR)
October 2, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, GMAC Mortgage LLC and Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC must file Corporate Disclosure Statements by 10/9/2018. (GMR)
October 2, 2018 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (GMR)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thurston County Superior Court, case number 18-2-04203-34; (Receipt # 0981-5490262), filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, GMAC Mortgage LLC and Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carson, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edenstrom v. GMAC Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERS Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Represented By: Ryan M. Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Ryan M. Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worldwide Abstract Services Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ideal Mortgage Bankers, Ltd dba Lend America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Ryan M. Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc
Represented By: Ryan M. Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ideal Mortgage Bankers Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Edenstrom
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Atkission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?