Kennedy et al v. General Dynamics Corporation et al

Plaintiff: General Dynamics Land Systems - Canada Global Services, Inc., David Kennedy and Nanthida Kennedy
Defendant: General Dynamics OTS (Aerospace) Inc., Christopher D. McFadden, General Dynamics Land Systems Customer Service & Support Company, General Dynamics Employee "Jane Doe" and "John Doe", General Dynamics Support Services Company, Nadine McFadden, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Land Systems, Jane Doe, John Doe, General Dynamics Land Systems Customer Service and Support Company, General Dynamics OTS (Aerospace), Inc., Does 1-15 and XYZ Corporations
Debtor In Possession: General Dynamics Land System Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv05797
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 23, 2018 23 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff David Kennedy, TO RESPONSE to #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Mazon, Michael)
November 19, 2018 22 DECLARATION of Dwayne Young filed by Defendants Jane Doe, John Doe, Does, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Land Systems, General Dynamics Land Systems - Canada Global Services, Inc., General Dynamics Land Systems Customer Service and Support Company, General Dynamics OTS (Aerospace), Inc., General Dynamics Support Services Company re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Martens, Richard)
November 19, 2018 21 DECLARATION of Jason Monahan filed by Defendants Jane Doe, John Doe, Does, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Land Systems, General Dynamics Land Systems - Canada Global Services, Inc., General Dynamics Land Systems Customer Service and Support Company, General Dynamics OTS (Aerospace), Inc., General Dynamics Support Services Company re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Martens, Richard)
November 19, 2018 20 DECLARATION of Scott Callahan filed by Defendants Jane Doe, John Doe, Does, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Land Systems, General Dynamics Land Systems - Canada Global Services, Inc., General Dynamics Land Systems Customer Service and Support Company, General Dynamics OTS (Aerospace), Inc., General Dynamics Support Services Company re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Martens, Richard)
November 19, 2018 19 RESPONSE, by Defendants Jane Doe, John Doe, Does, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Land Systems, General Dynamics Land Systems - Canada Global Services, Inc., General Dynamics Land Systems Customer Service and Support Company, General Dynamics OTS (Aerospace), Inc., General Dynamics Support Services Company, to #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martens, Richard)
November 16, 2018 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Nadine McFadden on 11/2/2018, filed by Plaintiff David Kennedy. (Mazon, Michael)
November 16, 2018 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Christopher McFadden on 11/2/2018, filed by Plaintiff David Kennedy. (Mazon, Michael)
October 29, 2018 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court, filed by Plaintiff David Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit) Noting Date 11/23/2018, (Mazon, Michael)
October 11, 2018 15 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendants General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Land Systems, General Dynamics Land Systems - Canada Global Services, Inc., General Dynamics Land Systems Customer Service and Support Company, General Dynamics OTS (Aerospace), Inc., General Dynamics Support Services Company (Martens, Richard)
October 9, 2018 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent General Dynamics Corporation, Corporate Parent General Dynamics Ordinance and Tactical Systems, Inc. for General Dynamics OTS (Aerospace), Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by General Dynamics OTS (Aerospace), Inc. (Martens, Richard)
October 9, 2018 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent General Dynamics Land Systems Customer Service & Support Company, Corporate Parent General Dynamics Corporation, Corporate Parent General Dynamics Land Systems Inc. for General Dynamics Support Services Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by General Dynamics Support Services Company (Martens, Richard)
October 9, 2018 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by General Dynamics Land Systems (Martens, Richard)
October 9, 2018 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent General Dynamics Corporation, Corporate Parent General Dynamics Land Systems Inc. for General Dynamics Land Systems Customer Service and Support Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by General Dynamics Land Systems Customer Service and Support Company (Martens, Richard)
October 9, 2018 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by General Dynamics Land Systems (Martens, Richard)
October 9, 2018 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by General Dynamics Land Systems - Canada Global Services, Inc. (Martens, Richard)
October 9, 2018 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by General Dynamics Corporation (Martens, Richard)
October 5, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 1/3/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/20/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/27/2018. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
October 2, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jane J. Matthews on behalf of Defendants General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Land Systems, General Dynamics Land Systems - Canada Global Services, Inc., General Dynamics Land Systems Corporation, General Dynamics Land Systems Customer Service and Support Company, General Dynamics OTS (Aerospace) Inc., General Dynamics Support Services Company. (Matthews, Jane)
October 2, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Angeli-Ann Punzalan Kim on behalf of Defendants General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Land Systems, General Dynamics Land Systems - Canada Global Services, Inc., General Dynamics Land Systems Corporation, General Dynamics Land Systems Customer Service and Support Company, General Dynamics OTS (Aerospace) Inc., General Dynamics Support Services Company. (Kim, Angeli-Ann)
October 2, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, General Dynamics Corporation defendants must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/9/2018. (CMG)
October 2, 2018 4 NOTICE TO FILER re #1 Notice of Removal - signatures missing. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (CMG)
October 2, 2018 3 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CMG)
October 2, 2018 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (CMG)
October 1, 2018 2 ANSWER to Complaint; by General Dynamics Land System Corporation.(Martens, Richard)
October 1, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 18-2-11062-4; (Receipt # 0981-5491807), filed by General Dynamics Corporation, et al. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martens, Richard) Modified on 10/2/2018: modified text language on attachment 1; and corrected filer information (CMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy et al v. General Dynamics Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics OTS (Aerospace) Inc.
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Martens
Represented By: Jane J. Matthews
Represented By: Angeli-Ann Punzalan Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher D. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Land Systems Customer Service & Support Company
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Martens
Represented By: Jane J. Matthews
Represented By: Angeli-Ann Punzalan Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Employee "Jane Doe" and "John Doe"
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Martens
Represented By: Jane J. Matthews
Represented By: Angeli-Ann Punzalan Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Support Services Company
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Martens
Represented By: Jane J. Matthews
Represented By: Angeli-Ann Punzalan Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadine McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Corporation
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Martens
Represented By: Jane J. Matthews
Represented By: Angeli-Ann Punzalan Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Land Systems
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Martens
Represented By: Jane J. Matthews
Represented By: Angeli-Ann Punzalan Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Land Systems Customer Service and Support Company
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Martens
Represented By: Angeli-Ann Punzalan Kim
Represented By: Jane J. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics OTS (Aerospace), Inc.
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Martens
Represented By: Angeli-Ann Punzalan Kim
Represented By: Jane J. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Dynamics Land Systems - Canada Global Services, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Martens
Represented By: Jane J. Matthews
Represented By: Angeli-Ann Punzalan Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kennedy
Represented By: Adam D Trotsky
Represented By: Michael Eger Mazon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nanthida Kennedy
Represented By: Adam D Trotsky
Represented By: Michael Eger Mazon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: General Dynamics Land System Corporation
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Martens
Represented By: Angeli-Ann Punzalan Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?