Green v. Dinucci et al
Plaintiff: William L Green
Defendant: Sanford Kallal, Paul D Pearigen, Jeffrey W Bitterman, April C Dinucci, Richard V Spencer, James K Writer, Mike Elmstrom and Janice Poore
Case Number: 3:2018cv05800
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to All defendants on 10/3/2018, filed by Plaintiff William L Green. (Green, William)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 PRAECIPE to Update #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff William L Green. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Complaint for Violiaton of Civil Rights p. 7, #2 Envelope)(SP) Modified on 11/8/2018 to add Jury Demand text (SP).
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE ; filed by Plaintiff William L Green. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Jury Demand / Amendment)(Green, William)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE: Plaintiff William L Green has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/9/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/26/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/2/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 10/11/2018 (DN). (cc to pltf)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 10/11/2018 (DN). (cc to pltf)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 Summons(es) Issued to Plaintiff (Intake) in Paper Form as to defendant(s) Jeffrey W Bitterman, April C Dinucci, Mike Elmstrom, Sanford Kallal, Paul D Pearigen, Janice Poore, Richard V Spencer, and James K Writer. (SP)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS, filed by Plaintiff William L Green. (SP)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Jeffrey W Bitterman, April C Dinucci, Mike Elmstrom, Sanford Kallal, Paul D Pearigen, Janice Poore, Richard V Spencer and James K Writer, filed by William L Green. (Summons(es) not received to issue) (Receipt # TAC015350) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-U, #2 Exhibit V1-UU2, #3 Exhibit W1-AG2, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(SP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Dinucci et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanford Kallal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul D Pearigen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey W Bitterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April C Dinucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard V Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James K Writer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Elmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Poore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William L Green
Represented By: William L Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?