Green v. United States of America

Plaintiff: William L Green
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv05804
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
0 Judge: Robert J Bryan
1 Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2018 7 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to United States Attorney on 10/9/2018, filed by Plaintiff William L Green. (Green, William)
October 29, 2018 6 NOTICE: Plaintiff William L Green has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB)
October 5, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/3/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/20/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/27/2018, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 10/5/2018 (DN). (cc to pltf)
October 5, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 10/5/2018 (DN). (cc to pltf)
October 5, 2018 3 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald B. Leighton for all further proceedings. Judge Robert J. Bryan no longer assigned to case. s/Tyler Campbell, as directed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Cc to RBL. Paper copy sent to Plaintiff at Port Orchard address. (TC)
October 3, 2018 2 NOTICE of Related Case 3:18-cv-05800-RBL, filed by Plaintiff William L Green. (GMR)
October 3, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against defendant United States of America, filed by William L Green. (Summons issued) (Receipt # TAC015359) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William L Green
Represented By: William L Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?